EP2656249 - METHODS, APPARATUSES AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR CONVERTING A GEOGRAPHICAL DATABASE INTO A MAP TILE DATABASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 19.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWUCHUKWU, Tochukwu 1600 Villa Street Mountain View California 94041 / US | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 11851800.0 | 18.10.2011 | WO2011IB54612 | Priority number, date | US20100973514 | 20.12.2010 Original published format: US 973514 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012085693 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2656249 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F3/048, G08G1/0969 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
G06F16/29 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/23 (KR);
G06F16/245 (KR);
G06F3/048 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKTE ZUR UMWANDLUNG EINER GEOGRAFISCHEN DATENBANK IN EINE GEKACHELTE KARTENDATENBANK | [2013/44] | English: | METHODS, APPARATUSES AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR CONVERTING A GEOGRAPHICAL DATABASE INTO A MAP TILE DATABASE | [2013/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, APPAREILS ET PRODUITS PROGRAMMES D'ORDINATEUR POUR CONVERTIR UNE BASE DE DONNÉES GÉOGRAPHIQUES EN BASE DE DONNÉES DE PAVÉS DE CARTE | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 23.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/47] | 17.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.12.2018 | 14.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009137967 (SHANGHAI HEWLETT PACKARD CO LT [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,4-11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-10 * [I] 3; | [I] - Anonymous, "R-tree - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20100721), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=R-tree&oldid=374754430, (20160818), XP055296444 [I] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP1473543 (NAVIGATION TECH CORP [US]); | [A]US6879980 (KOTHURI RAVI KANTH V [US], et al); | [A]US7580927 (ABUGOV DANIEL [US], et al); | [X]WO2009137967 (SHANGHAI HEWLETT PACKARD CO LT [CN], et al) |