EP2659441 - DYNAMIC INTERACTIVE SEAT MAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STUBHUB, Inc. 175 Greenwich Street, Floor 59 New York NY 10007 / US | [2023/46] |
Former [2013/45] | For all designated states Stubhub Inc. 199 Fremont Street 3rd Floor San Francisco, California 94105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALLES, Benjamin 1751 Van Buran Street San Mateo California 94405 / US | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11852955.1 | 27.12.2011 | WO2011US67410 | Priority number, date | US20100979289 | 27.12.2010 Original published format: US 979289 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012092287 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2659441 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/02, G06Q30/00, G06Q30/06 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
G06Q30/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0643 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/45] | G06Q10/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE INTERAKTIVE SITZKARTE | [2013/45] | English: | DYNAMIC INTERACTIVE SEAT MAP | [2013/45] | French: | CARTE DE SIÈGES INTERACTIVE DYNAMIQUE | [2013/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 07.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.10.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 08.12.2020 | Appeal received No. T0133/21 | 08.12.2020 | Payment of appeal fee | 03.02.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.07.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 02.07.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2002082879 (MILLER BRENT [US], et al); | [Y]US2007265892 (VALENTINO VALENO J [US]); | [A]US2008059889 (PARKER CHERYL [US], et al); | [A]US2010133339 (GIBSON ASHLEY [US], et al) |