EP2622398 - ELECTROFLUIDIC IMAGING FILM, DEVICES, AND DISPLAYS, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Cincinnati 2624 Clifton Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45221-0623 / US | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIKENFELD, Jason, C. 1644 Clio Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45230 / US | 02 /
HAGEDON, Matthew 3427 Cornell Place Apt. 3 Cincinnati, OH 45220 / US | 03 /
DEAN, Kenneth, A. 15633 South Fifth Drive Phoenix, AZ 85045 / US | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11853603.6 | 30.09.2011 | WO2011US54267 | Priority number, date | US201113248826 | 29.09.2011 Original published format: US201113248826 | US20100388272P | 30.09.2010 Original published format: US 388272 P | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012091776 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2622398 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/00, H01J9/00 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
G02B26/005 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49124 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Title | German: | ELEKTROFLUIDISCHER BILDGEBUNGSFILM, VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR UND ANZEIGEN DAMIT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2013/32] | English: | ELECTROFLUIDIC IMAGING FILM, DEVICES, AND DISPLAYS, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2013/32] | French: | FILM, DISPOSITIFS ET ÉCRANS D'IMAGERIE ÉLECTROFLUIDIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 07.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 24.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 07.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 07.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009036272 (UNIV CINCINNATI [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3-15; | [I]WO2006090317 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1,2 * figures 3,7 *; | [A]US2008247920 (POLLACK MICHAEL G [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0092]; figures 1,6 *; | [A]WO2005119306 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * page 8, lines 24-31; figure 7 * | [A] - MANJEET DHINDSA ET AL, "Virtual electrowetting channels: electronic liquid transport with continuous channel functionality", LAB ON A CHIP, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY - CAMBRIDGE, GB, vol. 10, no. 7, doi:10.1039/B925278A, ISSN 1473-0197, (20100401), pages 832 - 836, (20100226), XP007912321 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b925278a | International search | [Y]WO2009036272 (UNIV CINCINNATI [US], et al); | [Y]US2010053717 (TAKAHASHI KENICHI [JP]); | [Y]WO2010104392 (POLYMER VISION LTD [NL], et al); | [A]US2008100922 (CHOI JAE-YOUNG [KR], et al); | [A]US2007279347 (MUNEYOSHI TAKAHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2006077330 (IJZERMAN WILLEM L [NL], et al); | [A]US2008225374 (HAYES ROBERT A [NL], et al); | [A]US2008174846 (MOROZUMI TAKESHI [JP], et al) | [Y] - DHINDSA ET AL., "Virtual electrowetting channels: electronic liquid transport with continuous channel functionality", LAB CHIP, (2010), vol. 10, pages 832 - 836, XP007912321 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b925278a | by applicant | WO2009036272 | - J. HEIKENFELD ET AL., "Electrofluidic displays using Young-Laplace transposition of brilliant pigment dispersions", NATURE PHOTONICS, (2009), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1038/nphoton.2009.68, pages 292 - 296, XP008152475 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nphoton.2009.68 | - T. KRUPENKIN; J. A. TAYLOR, "Reverse electrowetting as a new approach to high-power energy harvesting", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (2011), vol. 2, page 7322 |