EP2660036 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE USING A NANO-IMPRINT MOULD AND LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE MANUFACTURED THEREBY. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/45] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING NANO-IMPRINT MOULD, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE USING THE NANO IMPRINT MOULD MANUFACTURED THEREBY, AND LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE MANUFACTURED THEREBY | ||
[2017/52] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSTECH Academy-Industry Foundation San 31, Hyoja-dong Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyunybuk 790-784 / KR | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jong Lam E-1403 Kyosu Apt Jigok-dong Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 790-751 / KR | 02 /
SON, Jun Ho 102-502 Daepyeong greenvil Daepyeong-dong Gyeongsan-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 712-780 / KR | 03 /
SONG, Yang Hee 311-1103 Mujigae Maeul Kunyoung Apt Gumi-dong Bundang-du Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-706 / KR | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Denninger Str. 169 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstrasse 14 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11854018.6 | 28.10.2011 | WO2011KR08157 | Priority number, date | KR20100139089 | 30.12.2010 Original published format: KR 20100139089 | [2013/45] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012091270 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2660036 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
H01L33/007 (EP,US);
H01L33/32 (US);
H01L21/302 (US);
H01L33/36 (US);
B82Y40/00 (US);
H01L2933/0091 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/45] | B29C59/02, B82B3/00, B82B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LED MIT VERWENDUNG EINER NANO-IMPRINTFORM UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE LED. | [2017/52] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE USING A NANO-IMPRINT MOULD AND LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE MANUFACTURED THEREBY. | [2017/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE UTILISANT UN MOULE DE NANOIMPRESSION ET DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE FABRIQUÉE AINSI. | [2017/52] |
Former [2013/45] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER NANO-IMPRINTFORM, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LED MIT VERWENDUNG DER DAMIT HERGESTELLTEN NANO-IMPRINTFORM UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE LED | ||
Former [2013/45] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING NANO-IMPRINT MOULD, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE USING THE NANO IMPRINT MOULD MANUFACTURED THEREBY, AND LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE MANUFACTURED THEREBY | ||
Former [2013/45] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MOULE DE NANOIMPRESSION, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE UTILISANT LE MOULE DE NANOIMPRESSION FABRIQUÉ AINSI ET DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE FABRIQUÉE AINSI | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2013 | Translation filed | 28.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 07.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 01.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]KR20080000884 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [Y] 12-15 * cited paragraphs refer to the machine translated by ThomsonReuters; paragraphs [0062] - [0073]; figures 4-9 * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0051] * [A] 5-9; | [XY]US2008131692 (ROLLAND JASON P [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0189] , [0192]; figure 4 * [Y] 4-15; | [Y]US2008283859 (CHEN SHIH-PENG [TW], et al) [Y] 4-11 * paragraphs [0035] - [0041]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0042] *; | [A]US2009057700 (JIN YONG SUNG [KR], et al) [A] 12* paragraph [0046]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2009072259 (CHEN SHIH-PENG [TW], et al) [A] 4,14 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0034]; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US2010075114 (KURIHARA KAZUMA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0053] , [0054]; figures 1,5 * | International search | [A]KR100762004B (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]); | [A]KR20080000884 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]); | [A]KR20090076327 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]KR20100000404 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20100011835 (LEE HEON [KR]) |