EP2661816 - METHOD FOR PARTICIPATING IN AN AD HOC NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/46] | AD HOC NETWORK | ||
[2018/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.S. Ramaiah School of Advanced Studies Gnanagangothri Campus New BEL Road MSR Nagar Bangalore, Karnataka 560054 / IN | [2013/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KADAMBI, Govind Rangaswamy 304 Kalpataru Apartment KT 4, No. 46, 13th Cross 8th Main Malleswaram, Bangalore Karnataka 560003 / IN | 02 /
SHARMA, Rinki C/o Mr. Narasimhachar K.N. 41 - A Vinaya Marga Siddartha Nagar, Mysore Karnataka 570011 / IN | 03 /
PONNURAJ, Shiva Kumar 36/A, 5th Main Road Bhuvaneshwarinagar T-Dasarahalli Bangalore Karnataka 560057 / IN | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2018/35] |
Former [2013/46] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | Application number, filing date | 11854899.9 | 24.02.2011 | [2018/35] | WO2011IB50772 | Priority number, date | IN2011CHE60 | 07.01.2011 Original published format: IN 60CH2011 | [2017/16] |
Former [2013/46] | IN2011CHE0060 | 07.01.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012093294 | Date: | 12.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2661816 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2661816 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/14, H04W76/15, // H04W84/18, H04W48/16, H04W8/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
H04W76/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04W8/005 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | H04W76/02, // H04W84/18 | ||
Former IPC [2013/46] | H04B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TEILNAHME IN EINEM AD-HOC-NETZWERK | [2018/15] | English: | METHOD FOR PARTICIPATING IN AN AD HOC NETWORK | [2018/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PARTICIPATION DANS UN RÉSEAU AD HOC | [2018/15] |
Former [2013/46] | AD-HOC-NETZWERK | ||
Former [2013/46] | AD HOC NETWORK | ||
Former [2013/46] | RÉSEAU AD HOC | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 27.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2011 | AL | 29.08.2018 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | IT | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | RS | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | NO | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | PT | 29.12.2018 | IE | 24.02.2019 | LU | 24.02.2019 | MT | 24.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 24.02.2019 | ||
LU | 24.02.2019 | ||
MT | 24.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 24.02.2019 | ||
LU | 24.02.2019 | ||
MT | 24.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 24.02.2019 | ||
LU | 24.02.2019 | ||
MT | 24.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 24.02.2019 | ||
LU | 24.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 24.02.2019 | ||
LU | 24.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 24.02.2019 | ||
LU | 24.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO02078369 (FHP WIRELESS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * page 7 - page 19; figures 6-17 * [A] 4-9; | [YA]US2007225044 (LAW KA L E [CA], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0114]; figure 7 * [A] 4-9; | [A] - KANG X-N ET AL, "A dual-channel MAC protocol with directional antennas for mobile ad-hoc networks", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (20071101), vol. E90B, no. 11, doi:10.1093/IETCOM/E90-B.11.3266, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 3266 - 3270, XP001510053 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ietcom/e90-b.11.3266 | [A] - FERHAT YILDIRIM ET AL, "Directional MAC for 60 GHz Using Polarization Diversity Extension (DMAC-PDX)", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2007. GLOBECOM '07. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071101), ISBN 978-1-4244-1042-2, pages 4697 - 4701, XP031196819 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [T] - RINKI SHARMA ET AL, "Dual Polarised Directional Communication Based Medium Access Control Protocol for Performance Enhancement of MANETs", 2015 FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS AND NETWORK TECHNOLOGIES, (20150401), doi:10.1109/CSNT.2015.104, ISBN 978-1-4799-1797-6, pages 185 - 189, XP055290767 [T] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CSNT.2015.104 | [T] - R Sharma, "Simulation Studies on Effects of Dual Polarisation and Directivity of Antennas on the Performance of MANETs", Unpublished PhD Thesis, (20141101), pages 1 - 312, URL: https://curve.coventry.ac.uk/open/items/4cc65581-8030-45bc-8136-82fdf902052e/1/Sharma 2014.pdf, (20160725), XP055290919 [T] 1-9 * page 112 - page 185 * | International search | [A]US2004162115 (SMITH MARTIN [GB], et al); | [A]WO2007091219 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al); | [A]US2008267259 (BUDAMPATI RAMAKRISHNA S [US], et al) | by applicant | WO02078369 | US2007225044 | - KANG X-N ET AL., A DUAL-CHANNEL MAC PROTOCOL WITH DIRECTIONAL ANTENNAS FOR MOBILE AD-HOC NETWORKS |