EP2662767 - COMPUTATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND BRANCH PREDICTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UKAI, Megumi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Schultes, Stephan Haseltine Lake LLP 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2013/46] | Application number, filing date | 11855093.8 | 07.01.2011 | WO2011JP50189 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012093489 | Date: | 12.07.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2662767 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, G06F9/32 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
G06F9/3806 (EP,US);
G06F9/3844 (US);
G06F9/322 (EP,US);
G06F9/323 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Title | German: | BERECHNUNGSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERZWEIGUNGSVORHERSAGEVERFAHREN | [2013/46] | English: | COMPUTATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND BRANCH PREDICTION METHOD | [2013/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE CALCUL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION DE BRANCHEMENT | [2013/46] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2013 | Translation filed | 31.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 12.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63211462 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH03127125 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | by applicant | JPH04225429 | JP2001184231 | JP2006155374 |