EP2664180 - METHODS AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING CONTENT TO A MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/47] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTLER, Brian Steven 1 Rembrandt Close Graham Terrace London SW1W 8HS / GB | 02 /
SIRCAR, Shiladitya 13009-3026 Solandt Road Suite 100, 102 Kanata Ontario K2K 2A5 / CA | 03 /
KUMAR, Arun 78595-3026 Solandt Road Suite 100, 102 Kanata Ontario K2K 2A5 / CA | 04 /
MOLLINS, Patrick 13346-450 March Road Kanata Ontario K2K 3K2 / CA | 05 /
KEWALRAMANI, Vikram 115 Hillcrest Avenue Apt 706 Mississauga, Ontario L5B 3Y9 / CA | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2017/33] |
Former [2013/47] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11855820.4 | 12.01.2011 | [2017/33] | WO2011CA50009 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012094721 | Date: | 19.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2664180 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2664180 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 19.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/06, H04L12/16, H04L29/10, H04W4/00 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
H04W4/20 (EP,US);
H04L12/2812 (US);
H04L67/51 (US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON INHALTEN FÜR EINE MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/47] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING CONTENT TO A MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2013/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE DE CONTENU À UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2013/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 18.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2011 | AL | 16.08.2017 | AT | 16.08.2017 | CY | 16.08.2017 | CZ | 16.08.2017 | DK | 16.08.2017 | EE | 16.08.2017 | ES | 16.08.2017 | FI | 16.08.2017 | HR | 16.08.2017 | IT | 16.08.2017 | LT | 16.08.2017 | LV | 16.08.2017 | MC | 16.08.2017 | MK | 16.08.2017 | NL | 16.08.2017 | PL | 16.08.2017 | PT | 16.08.2017 | RO | 16.08.2017 | RS | 16.08.2017 | SE | 16.08.2017 | SI | 16.08.2017 | SK | 16.08.2017 | SM | 16.08.2017 | TR | 16.08.2017 | BG | 16.11.2017 | NO | 16.11.2017 | GR | 17.11.2017 | IS | 16.12.2017 | IE | 12.01.2018 | LU | 12.01.2018 | MT | 12.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 12.01.2011 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
HR | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
MT | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 12.01.2011 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
HR | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
MT | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 12.01.2011 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
MT | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
MT | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
MT | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 16.08.2017 | |
NO | 16.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2006265637 (MARRIOTT GREG [US], et al) [Y] 4-8,13 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0081] , [0082] * * paragraphs [0086] , [0087] * * paragraph [0091] *[A] 1-3,9-12,14,15; | [IY]EP2088748 (WILICO WIRELESS NETWORKING SOL [ES]) [I] 1-3,9-12,14,15 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0075] * [Y] 4-8,13; | [IY]EP2164231 (JENTRO TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-3,9-12,14,15 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0070] * [Y] 4-8,13 | International search | [Y]WO03019796 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]US2005216519 (MAYO GLENNA G [US], et al); | [Y]WO2009015257 (DIRECTV GROUP INC [US], et al); | [A]US2010049608 (GROSSMAN STEPHANIE L [US]) |