EP2667995 - TANGENTIAL CUTTING INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAEGUTEC LTD. 304, Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon, Dalsung-gun Daegu 711-860 / KR | [2015/48] |
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states TAEGUTEC LTD. 304, Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon, Dalsung-gun Daegu-si 711-860 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Chang Hee c/o TaeguTec LTD. 304, Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalsung-gun Daegu 711-860 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Chang Gyu c/o TaeguTec LTD. 304, Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalsung-gun Daegu 711-860 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jae Wook c/o TaeguTec LTD. 304, Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalsung-gun Daegu 711-860 / KR | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/50] |
Former [2013/49] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11856971.4 | 13.12.2011 | [2015/50] | WO2011KR09572 | Priority number, date | KR20110008310 | 27.01.2011 Original published format: KR 20110008310 | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012102480 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2667995 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2667995 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/22, B23C5/20, B23C5/02, B23B27/16 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
B23C5/08 (EP,KR,US);
B23C5/205 (KR);
B23C5/202 (EP,US);
B23C2200/0455 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/085 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/203 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TANGENTIALSCHNEIDEEINSATZ | [2013/49] | English: | TANGENTIAL CUTTING INSERT | [2013/49] | French: | PLAQUETTE À COUPE TANGENTIELLE | [2013/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 12.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2011 | AL | 09.12.2015 | BE | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | ES | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | IT | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | MK | 09.12.2015 | MT | 09.12.2015 | NL | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | RS | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | SM | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | IE | 13.12.2015 | LU | 13.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | FR | 09.02.2016 | GB | 09.03.2016 | NO | 09.03.2016 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 09.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 09.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 09.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 09.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 09.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | BE | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | EE | 09.12.2015 | |
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | EE | 09.12.2015 | |
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | EE | 09.12.2015 | |
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 09.12.2015 | |
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4531864 (BYLUND SVEN O [SE]) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0703032 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 17 *; | [A]DE29912025U (ISCAR LTD [IL]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]EP1072347 (INGERSOLL MACH & TOOL CO [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2006210364 (BELLMANN BERNHARD [DE], et al) [A] 5* paragraph [0069]; claims 2,3 *; | [A]WO2009157603 (TAEGU TEC LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1 * figures 9,10 * | International search | [A]WO2006041353 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [SE], et al); | [A]JP2010142948 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY); | [A]KR20100093236 (KORLOY INC [KR]); | [A]KR20100130041 (TAEGU TEC LTD [KR]) |