EP2672200 - COOLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOJIMA, Yuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2017/42] |
Former [2013/50] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11857535.6 | 04.02.2011 | [2017/42] | WO2011JP52387 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012105047 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2672200 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2672200 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00, B60H1/32, B60L3/00, B60L11/18, H01M10/44, H02J7/00, B60L1/00, B60L1/02, B60H1/00, H01M10/46, H05K7/20 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
B60L1/003 (EP,US);
B60H1/32 (US);
B60L1/02 (EP,US);
B60L3/003 (EP,US);
B60L3/0046 (US);
B60L53/18 (EP,US);
B60L53/22 (EP,US);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
H02J7/00 (US);
H05K7/20354 (US);
B60H1/00271 (EP,US);
F25B2400/0403 (EP,US);
F25B2500/18 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2501 (EP,US);
H01M10/46 (EP,US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/50] | F25B1/00, B60H1/32, B60L3/00, B60L11/18, H01M10/44, H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2013/50] | English: | COOLING DEVICE | [2013/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2013/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2013 | Translation filed | 04.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 06.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2011 | AL | 18.10.2017 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | ES | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | IT | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | MK | 18.10.2017 | NL | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | PT | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | RS | 18.10.2017 | SE | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | SM | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | NO | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | GB | 04.02.2018 | IE | 04.02.2018 | LU | 04.02.2018 | MT | 04.02.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | FR | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.02.2011 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
GB | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
MT | 04.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 04.02.2011 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
GB | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
MT | 04.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
GB | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
MT | 04.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
GB | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
MT | 04.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
GB | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 18.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4238364 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 4-8* column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 17; figure 1a *; | [Y]US5606239 (SCHUMANN ANTON [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, lines 30-67; figure 1 *; | [Y]JPH09126617 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2010107180 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0060]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH0493557 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH04120577U (DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.); | [Y]JPH07280362 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [Y]JPH1126031 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2010280352 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH04275492 | JPH07312805 | JP2000073763 | JP2001309506 | JP2005090862 | JP2007069733 |