EP2717611 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING BEARER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Xiang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
DI, Zhiyu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HOU, Shaohui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11857546.3 | 01.07.2011 | WO2011CN76766 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012103737 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2717611 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/08, H04W76/02, H04L29/06, H04W28/02, // H04W28/18 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04W28/0263 (US);
H04L47/2441 (EP,US);
H04W28/0252 (US);
H04W76/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/15] | H04W24/00, H04W76/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TRÄGERVERARBEITUNG | [2014/15] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING BEARER | [2014/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SUPPORT | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2014 | Translation filed | 02.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 26.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2009140325 (STARENT NETWORKS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0030] , [0036] * [A] 2-10,12-15; | [XA]WO2010023645 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0005] , [0008] , [0011] , [0018] , [0023] - [0025] - [0029] - [0031] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] - [0041] , [0042] , [0044] , [0045] , [0050] - [0057] - [0062] , [0063] * [A] 2-10,12-15; | [A]US2010235877 (HU QINGMIN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0077] - [0083] - [0087] , [0115] , [0117]; claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO2011011790 (TEKELEC US [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0015] - [0019] - [0022] , [0024] , [0027] - [0032] - [0036] - [0038] *; | [A]US2011080886 (CHANDRACHOOD SANTOSH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] , [0013] , [0019] , [0025] , [0027] - [0031] - [0035] , [0039] - [0043] *; | [XI] - EKSTROM H, "QoS control in the 3GPP evolved packet system", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20090201), vol. 47, no. 2, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2009.4785383, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 76 - 83, XP011280742 [X] 1,10,11,15 * the whole document * [I] 2-9,12-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2009.4785383 | International search | [Y]CN101043644 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US2010067400 (DOLGANOW ANDREW [CA], et al); | [X]CN101720111 (ZTE CORP); | [X]CN101720075 (ZTE CORP) |