EP2687410 - VEHICLE REMOTE OPERATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAMURA Ryuji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
SOBUE Yuka c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
HIEI Yu c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
MORIMOTO, Chika c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/04] | Application number, filing date | 11861227.4 | 16.03.2011 | WO2011JP56287 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012124085 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2687410 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/00, G05D1/00 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
B62D15/0285 (EP,US);
B60W30/06 (KR);
B62D6/00 (US);
B60R21/00 (KR);
B60W30/08 (KR);
G05D1/021 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN FERNBETRIEB VON FAHRZEUGEN | [2014/04] | English: | VEHICLE REMOTE OPERATION DEVICE | [2014/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE À DISTANCE DE VÉHICULE | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2013 | Translation filed | 18.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 01.05.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/24] | Divisional application(s) | EP14158929.1 / EP2746139 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007122704 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JP2008009913 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2008015839 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2008536734 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) | by applicant | JP2008536734 |