EP2693027 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Kenji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
ANZAWA, Takumi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
FUKUSHIRO, Eiji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
YAMAGUCHI, Katsuhiko c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/06] | Application number, filing date | 11861988.1 | 31.03.2011 | WO2011JP58195 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012131970 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2693027 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/08, F02D29/02, F02D41/14, F02D41/16 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
F02D29/02 (EP,US);
F02D41/0097 (US);
F02D41/021 (EP,US);
F02D41/08 (EP,US);
F02D41/1497 (EP,US);
F02D41/16 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0414 (EP,US);
F02D2250/28 (EP,US);
F02D41/086 (EP,US);
F02D41/1498 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/06] | F02D41/08, F02D29/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR UND DAMIT AUSGESTATTETES FAHRZEUG | [2014/06] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH SAME | [2014/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE ET VÉHICULE ÉQUIPÉ DE CELUI-CI | [2014/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2013 | Translation filed | 30.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 20.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 26.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0900683 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-17 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] - [0017] *; | [A]US2003196637 (BERGEON MILTON SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7-17 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] *; | [A]WO2006064980 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,7-17* paragraphs [0004] , [0006] * | International search | [X]JP2004332564 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP); | [Y]JP2005325832 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [A]JP2009180094 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) | by applicant | JP2006152877 | JP2007118728 |