EP2692386 - DEVICE FOR OTORHINOLARYNGOLOGICAL THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Katsuhiko c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 1500 Inokuchi Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | 02 /
KINOSHITA, Yasushi c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 1500 Inokuchi Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | 03 /
SUEHARA, Satoru c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 1500 Inokuchi Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | 04 /
OOTANI, Yousuke c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 8-2 1-chome Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 05 /
ARASTOO, Riyaheh c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 1500 Inokuchi Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | 06 /
KUMOYAMA, Kenichi c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 1500 Inokuchi Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2014/06] | Application number, filing date | 11862642.3 | 29.11.2011 | WO2011JP77583 | Priority number, date | JP20110072998 | 29.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011072998 | [2014/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012132114 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2692386 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/02, A61B1/00, A61B1/233, A61B17/24, // A61B1/06, A61B19/00, A61M25/10, A61M25/00 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
A61M29/02 (EP,US);
A61B1/00082 (EP);
A61B1/233 (EP);
A61B17/24 (EP);
A61B1/00147 (EP,US);
A61B1/0676 (EP);
A61B1/0684 (EP);
A61B2090/309 (EP);
A61B2090/3937 (EP);
A61B90/361 (EP);
A61M2025/0008 (EP);
A61M25/0041 (EP);
A61M25/1006 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/06] | A61M25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR HALS-NASEN-OHREN-THERAPIE | [2014/06] | English: | DEVICE FOR OTORHINOLARYNGOLOGICAL THERAPY | [2014/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT OTO-RHINO-LARYNGOLOGIQUE | [2014/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2013 | Translation filed | 26.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 09.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4737142 (HECKELE HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1-16* column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 14; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2008172033 (KEITH PETER T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-16 * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0159] * * figures 7A-7C * [Y] 3; | [Y]US2010076269 (MAKOWER JOSHUA [US], et al) [Y] 3 * figure 10 * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0085] * | International search | [Y]JPH0871070 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2008513125 (ACCLARENT, INC.) | by applicant | JP2008513125 |