EP2698597 - FILM THICKNESS MEASURING DEVICE AND FILM THICKNESS MEASURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nireco Corporation 2951-4 Ishikawa-Machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8522 / JP | [2014/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Takeo 1545-53 Shinohara-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0026 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Takeshi c/o Nireco Corporation 2951-4 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8522 / JP | 03 /
KAWAI, Shingo c/o Nireco Corporation 2951-4 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8522 / JP | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11863649.7 | 12.04.2011 | WO2011JP02163 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012140693 | Date: | 18.10.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2698597 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/06 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
G01B11/0625 (EP,US);
G01N21/41 (KR);
G01B11/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Title | German: | FILMDICKE-MESSVORRICHTUNG UND FILMDICKE-MESSVERFAHREN | [2014/08] | English: | FILM THICKNESS MEASURING DEVICE AND FILM THICKNESS MEASURING METHOD | [2014/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE D'ÉPAISSEUR DE FILM ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE D'ÉPAISSEUR DE FILM | [2014/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2013 | Translation filed | 21.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 21.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011032541 (YAMADA TAKEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8 * the whole document * [I] 2,6; | [A] - D. T. LARSON ET AL, "Surface Film Thickness Determination by Reflectance Measurements", APPLIED OPTICS, (19730601), vol. 12, no. 6, doi:10.1364/AO.12.001271, ISSN 0003-6935, page 1271, XP055130565 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.12.001271 | [A] - J.P MCCAFFREY ET AL, "Use of transmitted color to calibrate the thickness of silicon samples", MICRON, (19961201), vol. 27, no. 6, doi:10.1016/S0968-4328(96)00049-2, ISSN 0968-4328, pages 407 - 411, XP055130569 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-4328(96)00049-2 | International search | [Y]JP4482618B (NIRECO CORP.); | [Y]JP2001284424 (NIKON CORP); | [A]JP2973803B (TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.); | [A]JP2000065536 (OTSUKA DENSHI KK) | by applicant | JP2009068937 | JP3532165B | JP4482618B | JP3618090B |