EP2750444 - BLIND HANDOVER OR BLIND REDIRECTION METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/06] |
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEN, Yongming ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2018/06] |
Former [2014/27] | Richter Werdermann Gerbaulet Hofmann Patentanwälte Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11864941.7 | 14.12.2011 | [2018/06] | WO2011CN83963 | Priority number, date | CN201110267067 | 09.09.2011 Original published format: CN201110267067 | [2014/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012151991 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2750444 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2750444 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/24, // H04W36/08 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
H04W36/008375 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/27] | H04W36/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR BLINDE WEITERREICHUNG ODER BLINDE UMLEITUNG | [2014/27] | English: | BLIND HANDOVER OR BLIND REDIRECTION METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2014/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT AVEUGLE OU DE REDIRECTION AVEUGLE | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2012 | Translation filed | 07.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 12.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2011 | AL | 07.02.2018 | AT | 07.02.2018 | CY | 07.02.2018 | CZ | 07.02.2018 | DK | 07.02.2018 | EE | 07.02.2018 | ES | 07.02.2018 | FI | 07.02.2018 | HR | 07.02.2018 | IT | 07.02.2018 | LT | 07.02.2018 | LV | 07.02.2018 | MC | 07.02.2018 | MK | 07.02.2018 | NL | 07.02.2018 | PL | 07.02.2018 | PT | 07.02.2018 | RO | 07.02.2018 | RS | 07.02.2018 | SE | 07.02.2018 | SI | 07.02.2018 | SK | 07.02.2018 | SM | 07.02.2018 | TR | 07.02.2018 | BG | 07.05.2018 | NO | 07.05.2018 | GR | 08.05.2018 | IS | 07.06.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 14.12.2011 | |
AL | 07.02.2018 | ||
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PT | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PT | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1061752 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0093] *; | [A]EP1229754 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] ** paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] *; | [YA]EP1460874 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 2-5,7-10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0057] * * figure 4 * [A] 1,6; | [XY]EP2355582 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0051] * [Y] 2-5,7-10 | International search | [A]WO2007082368 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al); | [X]CN101300863 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [Y]CN101895949 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN102088718 (ZTE CORP) | Examination | US2004121770 | US2011177819 |