EP2747306 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INDICATING CONTROL CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yong ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
DAI, Bo ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Mozzi, Matteo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2014/26] | Application number, filing date | 11865110.8 | 26.12.2011 | WO2011CN84697 | Priority number, date | CN201110233284 | 15.08.2011 Original published format: CN201110233284 | [2014/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012152036 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2747306 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04L5/14 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0042 (EP,US);
H04L5/005 (EP,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE VON STEUERKANÄLEN | [2014/26] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INDICATING CONTROL CHANNEL | [2014/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'INDICATION DE CANAL DE CONTRÔLE | [2014/26] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2014 | Translation filed | 27.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 28.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2302830 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-17 * * paragraphs [0011] - [0027] * * paragraphs [0066] - [0075] * * paragraphs [0090] - [0101] *; | [X]WO2011053009 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-7 *; | [X]WO2011093644 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 41, line 10 - page 46, line 18 * * figures 16-18 *; | [E]US2012218964 (PARK KYU JIN [KR], et al) [E] 1-15 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0070] * * paragraphs [0078] - [0093] * * paragraphs [0105] - [0121] *; | [X] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall description; Stage 2 (Release 10)", 3GPP DRAFT; 36300-A40, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110623), vol. RAN WG2, XP050539110 [X] 1-15 * section 5 * | International search | [A]CN101714892 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN101789823 (ZTE CORP); | [A]WO2011038644 (ZTE CORP [CN], et al); | [A]CN102123432 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH); | [XP]CN102263616 (ZTE CORP.) |