EP2679015 - MONITORING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING A VIDEO SESSION IN A DATA NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VID SCALE, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2016/52] |
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, Martin Hesselerstrabe 32 52146 Wurselen / DE | 02 /
JURCA, Dan Riesstrasse 25 80992 Munich / DE | 03 /
CUNY, Renaud Riesstrasse 25 80992 Munich / DE | 04 /
BEKER, Sergio Riesstrasse 25 80992 Munich / DE | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/01] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 11867490.2 | 07.06.2011 | WO2011CN75366 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012167416 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2679015 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N17/00, H04L12/26, H04L12/24, H04N21/24 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
H04N17/004 (EP,US);
H04L43/0894 (EP,US);
H04L43/12 (EP,US);
H04N21/2401 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/01] | H04N17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER VIDEOSITZUNG IN EINEM DATENNETZWERK | [2014/01] | English: | MONITORING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING A VIDEO SESSION IN A DATA NETWORK | [2014/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DE SESSION VIDÉO DANS UN RÉSEAU DE DONNÉES | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 12.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 04.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA] - ERMAN B ET AL, "Analysis and realization of IPTV service quality", BELL LABS TECHNICAL JOURNAL, WILEY, CA, US, (20071221), vol. 12, no. 4, doi:10.1002/BLTJ.20276, ISSN 1089-7089, pages 195 - 212, XP001510905 [Y] 1-4,11-19 * abstract * * page 197 - page 207 * * page 210 * [A] 5-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bltj.20276 | [YA] - Pascal Hubbe ET AL, "4/10/2014 An Innovative Tool for Measuring Video Streaming QoE | TechZine | Alcatel-Lucenttechzine/an-innovative-tool-for-measuring-video-streaming-qoe/ 1/7", Techzine, (20110112), URL: http://www2.alcatel-lucent.com/techzine/an-innovative-tool-for-measuring-video-streaming-qoe/, (20140410), XP055113583 [Y] 1-4,11-19 * the whole document * [A] 5-10 | [YA] - RAAKE A ET AL, "T-V-model: Parameter-based prediction of IPTV quality", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2008. ICASSP 2008. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080331), ISBN 978-1-4244-1483-3, pages 1149 - 1152, XP031250760 [Y] 1-4,11-19 * abstract * * page 1149 - page 1151 * [A] 5-10 | [A] - JINSUL KIM ET AL, "IPTV Systems, Standards and Architectures: Part II -Heterogeneous Networks and Terminal-Aware QoS/QoE-Guaranteed Mobile IPTV Service", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20080501), vol. 46, no. 5, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2008.4511658, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 110 - 117, XP011226860 [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 110 - page 114 * * figures 1-3 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2008.4511658 | [A] - Xiangchun Tan ET AL, "Perceived Video Streaming Quality under Initial Buffering and Rebuffering Degradations", MESAQIN Conference 2006, Prague (Czech Republic), (20060605), URL: http://wireless.feld.cvut.cz/mesaqin2006/papers/5_FullPaper_PercVSQual_under_buff_MESAQIN2006.pdf, (20140121), XP055097502 [A] 1-19 * abstract * * 1. Introduction * * 2 Methods * * 3 Rebuffering time * * 7 Modelling * | [A] - ALI BEGEN ET AL, "Watching Video over the Web: Part 1: Streaming Protocols", IEEE INTERNET COMPUTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY.- INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, US, (20110301), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1109/MIC.2010.155, ISSN 1089-7801, pages 54 - 63, XP011363531 [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 76 - page 78 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MIC.2010.155 | [A] - EDITOR, "Draft Recommendation G.IPTV-PMMM â IPTV Performance monitoring â Measurement methodsâ (IPTV-GSI event, Geneva, 30 April â 7 May 2008);TD 179 (WP 3/12)", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2005-2008, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20080515), vol. 13/12, IPTV-GSI, pages 1 - 25, XP017517729 [A] 1-19 * Summary * * page 8 - page 23 * | International search | [Y]CN101635846 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN102055761 (CHINESE ACAD INST ACOUSTICS); | [Y] - RICKY K. P. MOK ET AL., "Measuring of Quality of Experience of HTTP Video Streaming", INTEGRATED NETWORK MANAGEMENT (IM), 2011 IFIP/IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, (20110527), pages 485 - 492, XP032035384 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INM.2011.5990550 |