EP2719222 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ESTABLISHING A TIME-FREQUENCY REFERENCE SIGNAL PATTERN CONFIGURATION IN A CARRIER EXTENSION OR CARRIER SEGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARBIT, Gilles 18 Carlyon Close Farnborough GU14 7BX / GB | 02 /
ZENG, Erlin Room 1605 Building A-12 Xi San Qi Jian Cai Cheng Fu Li Tao Yuan Haidian District Beijing 100096 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Haiming Room 1403 Unit 5 Building 101 Jiang Fu Jia Yuan Jiang Tai Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | 04 /
GAO, Chunyan Room 271 Building 6 Ru Yi Li Bei Cao Chang Hu Tong Xi Zhi Men Nei Da Jie Xicheng District Beijing 100035 / CN | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11867542.0 | 07.06.2011 | WO2011CN75381 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012167417 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2719222 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/18, H04L5/00, H04L25/02, H04W72/04, H04W24/10 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
H04L5/005 (EP,US);
H04L25/0222 (EP,US);
H04L25/0224 (EP,US);
H04L5/0005 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/0092 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/16] | H04W28/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FESTLEGUNG EINER ZEITFREQUENZREFERENZSIGNALMUSTERKONFIGURATION BEI EINER TRÄGERERWEITERUNG ODER EINEM TRÄGERSEGMENT | [2014/16] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ESTABLISHING A TIME-FREQUENCY REFERENCE SIGNAL PATTERN CONFIGURATION IN A CARRIER EXTENSION OR CARRIER SEGMENT | [2014/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉTABLISSEMENT D'UNE CONFIGURATION DE MOTIF DE SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE TEMPS-FRÉQUENCE DANS UNE EXTENSION DE PORTEUSE OU UN SEGMENT DE PORTEUSE | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 07.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010014481 (KO HYUN SOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 6A,6B * * paragraph [0150] * * paragraph [0158] * [I] 4,7; | [X]US2011111781 (CHEN WANSHI [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0120] * | International search | [A]CN101924610 (UNIV XIDIAN); | [A]US2011044250 (HAN JIN KYU [KR], et al); | [A]CN101682419 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]US2010285792 (CHEN RUNHUA [US], et al); | [A]WO2010107013 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al); | [A]WO2010117240 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) | by applicant | US2010014481 | US2011111781 |