EP2738877 - OFFSET FEED SATELLITE TELEVISION ANTENNA AND SATELLITE TELEVISION RECEIVER SYSTEM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuang-Chi Innovative Technology Ltd. 18B Block A No.1061 Xiangmei Road Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518034 / CN | For all designated states Kuang-Chi Institute of Advanced Technology Software Building Room 1 No. 9 GaoxinZhong 1st Road High-Tech Industrial Estate Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/33] |
Former [2014/23] | For all designated states Kuang-Chi Institute of Advanced Technology Software Building No. 9 GaoxinZhong 1st Road High-Tech Industrial Estate Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
For all designated states Kuang-Chi Innovative Technology Ltd. 18B, Block A CIC International Business Center No. 1061 of XiangMei Road Futian District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518034 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Ruopeng Software Building No. 9 GaoxinZhong 1st Road High-Tech Industrial Estate Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
JI, Chunlin Software Building No. 9 GaoxinZhong 1st Road High-Tech Industrial Estate Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
YUE, Yutao Software Building No. 9 GaoxinZhong 1st Road High-Tech Industrial Estate Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Jinjin Software Building No. 9 GaoxinZhong 1st Road High-Tech Industrial Estate Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
HONG, Yunnan Software Building No. 9 GaoxinZhong 1st Road High-Tech Industrial Estate Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/09] |
Former [2014/23] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11870031.9 | 18.11.2011 | [2018/09] | WO2011CN82423 | Priority number, date | CN201110210203 | 26.07.2011 Original published format: CN201110210203 | CN201110210346 | 26.07.2011 Original published format: CN201110210346 | CN201110242602 | 23.08.2011 Original published format: CN201110242602 | CN201110242703 | 23.08.2011 Original published format: CN201110242703 | [2014/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013013456 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2738877 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2738877 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q19/10, H01Q15/00, H01Q15/10, H01Q15/23, H01Q19/06 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
H01Q15/0086 (EP,US);
H01Q19/06 (US);
H01Q15/02 (US);
H01Q15/10 (EP,US);
H01Q15/23 (EP,US);
H01Q19/065 (EP,US);
H01Q19/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/23] | H01Q19/10, H01Q15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OFFSET-EINSPEISUNGS-SATELLITENFERNSEHANTENNE UND SATELLITENFERNSEHEMPFÄNGERSYSTEM DAFÜR | [2014/23] | English: | OFFSET FEED SATELLITE TELEVISION ANTENNA AND SATELLITE TELEVISION RECEIVER SYSTEM THEREOF | [2014/23] | French: | ANTENNE DE TÉLÉVISION PAR SATELLITE À SOURCE PRIMAIRE DÉCALÉE ET SON SYSTÈME DE RÉCEPTION DE TÉLÉVISION PAR SATELLITE | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2014 | Translation filed | 21.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 22.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.11.2011 | AL | 28.02.2018 | AT | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | ES | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | IT | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | MK | 28.02.2018 | NL | 28.02.2018 | PL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | RS | 28.02.2018 | SE | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | SM | 28.02.2018 | TR | 28.02.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | NO | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | IE | 18.11.2018 | LU | 18.11.2018 | MT | 18.11.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 18.11.2011 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MK | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 18.11.2018 | ||
LU | 18.11.2018 | ||
MT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 18.11.2011 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 18.11.2018 | ||
LU | 18.11.2018 | ||
MT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 18.11.2018 | ||
LU | 18.11.2018 | ||
MT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 18.11.2018 | ||
LU | 18.11.2018 | ||
MT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 18.11.2018 | ||
LU | 18.11.2018 | ||
MT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 18.11.2018 | ||
LU | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2644092 (RISSER JACOB R) [A] 1-14 * column 2; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2278020 (FREWIN NIGEL [GB]) [A] 1-14 * page 6 - page 12; figures 3-8 *; | [A]JP2006153878 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US7570432 (YONAK SERDAR H [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 5, line 20 - column 8, line 18; figures 1-5 *; | [A] - WEI XIANG JIANG ET AL, "Planar reflector antenna design based on gradient-index metamaterials", MICROWAVE AND MILLIMETER WAVE TECHNOLOGY (ICMMT), 2010 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100508), ISBN 978-1-4244-5705-2, pages 431 - 433, XP031717221 [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [III.] - [0IV.]; figure 2 * | [A] - SMITH D R ET AL, "Gradient Index Metamaterials", PHYSICAL REVIEW E (STATISTICAL, NONLINEAR, AND SOFT MATTER PHYSICS), AMERICAN PHYSICAL SOCIETY, COLLEGE PARK, MD, US, (20050301), vol. 71, doi:10.1103/PHYSREVE.71.036609, ISSN 1539-3755, pages 36609 - 1, XP003024006 [A] 1-14 * page 1 - page 4; figures 1,2,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevE.71.036609 | [A] - HAJIAN M ET AL, "Electromagnetic analysis of beam- scanning antenna at millimeter-wave band based on photoconductivity using fresnel-zone-plate technique", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20031001), vol. 45, no. 5, doi:10.1109/MAP.2003.1252806, ISSN 1045-9243, pages 13 - 25, XP011104008 [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0007]; figure 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MAP.2003.1252806 | [A] - LAMBLEY R, "FRESNEL ANTENNA", ELECTRONICS WORLD, NEXUS MEDIA COMMUNICATIONS, SWANLEY, KENT, GB, (19890801), vol. 95, no. 1642, ISSN 0959-8332, page 792, XP000038450 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]FR2538959 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]TW200743264 (UNIV NAT TSING HUA [TW]); | [A]CN101699659 (UNIV SOUTHEAST); | [A]CN201515017U (UNIV SOUTHEAST); | [A]CN101867094 (UNIV LANZHOU) |