EP2771208 - START FAULT INDICATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husqvarna AB 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Husqvarna AB 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DWYER, Sean 9020 Heather Trace Gastonia, North Carolina 28056 / US | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11874455.6 | 28.10.2011 | WO2011US58275 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013062574 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2771208 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, A01D34/08, F02N11/10 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
A01D34/6818 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0064 (US);
A01D34/828 (EP,US);
F02N11/108 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/223 (EP,US);
F02N11/101 (EP,US);
F02N2200/02 (EP,US);
F02N2200/023 (EP,US);
F02N2200/061 (EP,US);
F02N2200/08 (EP,US);
F02N2200/0802 (EP,US);
F02N2200/0814 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/36] | B60Q1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ANZEIGE VON STARTSTÖRUNGEN | [2014/36] | English: | START FAULT INDICATOR SYSTEM | [2014/36] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INDICATEUR D'ANOMALIE DE DÉMARRAGE | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 26.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 31.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2021 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 31.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1059442 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-11,13-15 * paragraph [0079]; figures 2, 16 *; | [A]EP1333174 (DEFONTAINE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0036] , [0039] , [0040] , [0044]; figure . *; | [I]US6609357 (DAVIS DENNIS L [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure - *; | [A]US2004201286 (HARVEY ARTHUR JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0019] , [0050]; figure - *; | [X]WO2008005886 (HYDRO GEAR LTD PARTNERSHIP [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0084] , [0 86] - [0093] - [ 112] - [0116] - [ 172] - [0180]; figure - *; | [A]WO2009092157 (GREENE R S COMPANY [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 12, line 17 - line 19 *; | [I]WO2010051409 (BRIGGS & STRATTON CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0022] , [0040] - [0042]; figure - *; | [A]US2011084852 (SZCZERBA JOSEPH F [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 6A-6B * | International search | [Y]US6164560 (LEHRKE KENNETH EUGENE [US], et al); | [Y]US6609357 (DAVIS DENNIS L [US], et al); | [Y]US2010214107 (MONTEBOVI FRANCESCO [SE]); | [Y]US2011071420 (ST PIERRE SHAWN C [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2008005886 |