EP2772529 - PRODUCTION PROCESS MONITORING SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAN, Shunjie Xisanqi Zhibenshidai 15 1-1404 Haidian District Beijing 100096 / CN | 02 /
MENG, Xiantao Kandan 503 Jianxin Road No.19 Fengtai District Beijing 100070 / CN | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 11874524.9 | 28.10.2011 | WO2011CN81523 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013060027 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2772529 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/34, C12M1/00 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
C12M41/48 (EP,CN,US);
G05B15/02 (US);
C12M23/58 (EP,US);
C12M41/26 (EP,US);
C12M41/34 (EP,US);
C12M41/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/36] | C12M1/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES PRODUKTIONSPROZESSES UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/36] | English: | PRODUCTION PROCESS MONITORING SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2014/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE PROCESSUS DE PRODUCTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2014 | Translation filed | 24.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 22.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN1201826 (UNIV HUANAN NORMAL [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN2570287Y (LUAN LONG [CN]) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005035748 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1,13 * pages 2-4,7-9 *; | [A]DE10354406 (ESA PATENTVERWERTUNGSAGENTUR [DE], et al) [A] 1,13* paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0029] , [0032] *; | [XY]US2005158701 (WEST LARRY E [US]) [X] 1-6,13-15 * figures 2,3,4,6,8 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] , [0012] , [0014] , [0016] , [0018] , [0042] - [0049] * [Y] 1-15; | [A]CN101750989 (ENN TECHNOLOGY DEV CO LTD) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010142004 (KATHOLIEKE UNIVERSIFEIT LEUVEN [BE], et al) [A] 1,13 * pages 3-6,9-12 * | International search | [A]CN1201826 (UNIV HUANAN NORMAL [CN]); | [A]CN2570287Y (LUAN LONG [CN]); | [A]CN101750989 (ENN TECHNOLOGY DEV CO LTD) | by applicant | - BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING JOURNAL, (2003), vol. 14, pages 51 - 65 |