EP2771802 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING INDUSTRIAL PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2014/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE SANT, Aurelien 30 Main Street, nr.112 Melrose, MA 02176 / US | 02 /
WILKINS, Christopher Carey 6 Smythe Street Haverhill, MA 01830 / US | 03 /
CROWLEY, Michael 41 Turtle Cove Road Sandwich, MA 0237 / US | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Zerbi, Guido Maria Murgitroyd & Company Piazza Borromeo, 12 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Zerbi, Guido Maria Murgitroyd & Company Piazza Borromeo, 12 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11874654.4 | 30.12.2011 | WO2011US68135 | Priority number, date | US201161550795P | 24.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161550795 P | [2014/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013062604 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2771802 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, H04L29/06, G05B19/042 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
H04L63/1433 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (CN);
G05B15/02 (US);
A61B46/00 (CN);
G05B19/0425 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
H04L43/08 (US);
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00889 (CN);
A61B46/40 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2014/36] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG INDUSTRIELLER PROZESSE | [2014/36] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING INDUSTRIAL PROCESSES | [2014/36] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE PROCÉDÉS INDUSTRIELS | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 20.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/24] | 19.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007150570 (EASTHAM BRYANT [US]) [X] 1-4,8-11,14 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * [Y] 1,5-8,12-15; | [Y]US2010208069 (REZVANI BABAK [US], et al) [Y] 1,5-8,12-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] ** paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0048] * | International search | [Y]US2003204560 (CHEN THOMAS C H [US], et al); | [Y]US2004260404 (RUSSELL THOMAS C [US], et al); | [Y]US2010114333 (OTOKOZAWA TAKAO [JP]) |