EP2774792 - VEHICLE SIDE DOOR STRUCTURE AND VEHICLE OCCUPANT PROTECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORII, Nobuyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/37] | Application number, filing date | 11874900.1 | 02.11.2011 | WO2011JP75342 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013065158 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2774792 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/00, B60R13/02, B60R21/04, B60J5/04 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
B60R21/0428 (EP,US);
B60J5/0451 (EP,US);
B60J5/0452 (EP,US);
B60J5/0461 (US);
B60R21/23138 (US);
B60R2021/0006 (US);
B60R2021/0055 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | B60J5/00, B60R13/02, B60R21/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | SEITENTÜRSTRUKTUR EINES FAHRZEUGES UND FAHRZEUGINSASSENSCHUTZSYSTEM | [2014/37] | English: | VEHICLE SIDE DOOR STRUCTURE AND VEHICLE OCCUPANT PROTECTION SYSTEM | [2014/37] | French: | STRUCTURE DE PORTIÈRE LATÉRALE DE VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION DE L'OCCUPANT D'UN VÉHICULE | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2014 | Translation filed | 18.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 08.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/21] | 11.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5865496 (ODAN SEIJI [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * column 2, line 45 - line 53 * * column 3, line 10 - line 24 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 7 * * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 39 * * page 1,; figures 1,2,8 *; | [A]US2002195833 (FUKUTOMI TAKESHI [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2009224571 (HUTTSELL BENJAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0101] ** figures 1,5,6 * | International search | [A]JPS53147323 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]JPH07232554 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2005138838 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [Y]JP2008094235 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2011513136 (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.) | by applicant | JPH07232554 | JP2005138838 | JP2008254635 |