EP2774064 - DISTRIBUTED EVENT PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EntIT Software LLC 1140 Enterprise Way, Building G Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2017/46] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Yizheng 5 Results Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Wei 5 Results Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
WESTON, Michael, Scott 5 Results Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 04 /
AGUILAR-MACIAS, Hector 5 Results Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 05 /
WISER, David Earl 5 Results Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus Schoppe, Zimmermann Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11875015.7 | 20.12.2011 | WO2011US66060 | Priority number, date | US201161555548P | 04.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161555548 P | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013066361 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2774064 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/40, H04L29/06, H04L12/26 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
H04L43/04 (EP,US);
G06F16/285 (US);
G06F16/2272 (EP,US);
H04L43/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | G06F17/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | VERTEILTE EREIGNISVERARBEITUNG | [2014/37] | English: | DISTRIBUTED EVENT PROCESSING | [2014/37] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'ÉVÉNEMENTS RÉPARTIS | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 22.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 04.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2017 | 31.12.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5781703 (DESAI ARUN K [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 20 * * column 3, line 13 - line 36 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 49 ** column 6, line 43 - line 49 *; | [X]US7024468 (MEYER JEFFREY D [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 7, line 15 - column 8, line 50; figures 1,2 * * column 11, line 21 - column 13, line 62 * * column 15, line 24 - line 27 * * column 16, line 18 - line 23 * * column 18, line 23 - line 52 * | International search | [A]US2002032871 (MALAN GERALD R [US], et al); | [A]US2007180526 (COPELAND JOHN A III [US]); | [A]US2010050260 (NAKAKOJI HIROFUMI [JP], et al); | [A]US2010088354 (WU WEIXUN [CN], et al) | by applicant | US5781703 | US7024468 |