EP2775487 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/37] | REACTOR AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | ||
[2015/40] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO Yasuhiro c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
NOMIZO Fumio c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 11875123.9 | 04.11.2011 | WO2011JP75472 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013065183 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2775487 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01F37/00, H01F27/32, H01F5/04, H01F41/10, H01F17/04 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
H01F37/00 (EP,US);
H01F41/10 (US);
H01F27/325 (EP,US);
H01F5/04 (EP,US);
H01F2017/046 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4902 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | H01F37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES REAKTORS | [2015/40] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A REACTOR | [2015/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN RÉACTEUR | [2015/40] |
Former [2014/37] | REAKTOR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2014/37] | REACTOR AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | ||
Former [2014/37] | RÉACTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CE DERNIER | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2013 | Translation filed | 10.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2013 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 09.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/34] | 04.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003094535 (SCHMIDT STEPHEN M [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] , [0026] , [0028] - [0032] *; | [A]JP2007200926 (TDK CORP) [A] 1* abstract * | International search | [A]JP2002291186 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2007180140 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JP2007200926 (TDK CORP); | [Y]JP2007250801 (TAGA MFG); | [Y]JP2010206104 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2010226138 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JP2010245457 | JP2010245154 | JP2011100842 |