EP2783350 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR REFLECTIVE SYMMETRY BASED 3D MODEL COMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Wenfei 8th Floor Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road, Haidian District Beijing 100192 / CN | 02 /
CAI, Kangying 8th Floor Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road, Haidian District Beijing 100192 / CN | 03 /
LUO, Tao 8th Floor Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road, Haidian District Beijing 100192 / CN | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Huchet, Anne Technicolor 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 11876305.1 | 25.11.2011 | WO2011CN82985 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013075339 | Date: | 30.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2783350 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
G06T9/001 (EP,US);
G06T17/10 (US);
G06T15/005 (US);
G06T2219/2008 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/40] | G06T15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR AUF REFLEKTIERENDER SYMMETRIE BASIERENDE KOMPRIMIERUNG VON 3D-MODELLEN | [2014/40] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR REFLECTIVE SYMMETRY BASED 3D MODEL COMPRESSION | [2014/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE COMPRESSION DE MODÈLE TRIDIMENSIONNEL BASÉE SUR UNE SYMÉTRIE DE RÉFLEXION | [2014/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 12.07.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008170795 (AKENINE-MOLLER TOMAS [SE], et al) [X] 1,8,13 * abstract * [I] 2-7,9-12,14,15; | [XI]WO2010149492 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [X] 1,8,13 * abstract * [I] 2-7,9-12,14,15; | [XI] - CAI K ET AL, "Exploiting repeated patterns for efficient compression of massive models", PROCEEDINGS VRCAI. ACM SIGGRAPH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ONVIRTUAL REALITY CONTINUUM AND ITS APPLICATIONS IN INDUSTRY, XX, XX, (20091214), no. 8TH, ISBN 978-1-60558-912-1, pages 145 - 150, XP002598408 [X] 1,8,13 * abstract * [I] 2-7,9-12,14,15 | [XI] - MUDUR S P ET AL, "3D Compression of Engineering Models for Cooperative Computing Applications", INTERNET CITATION, (20020121), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://www.angelfire.com/space2/dineshshikhare/publications.html, (20100824), XP002598407 [X] 1,8,13 * abstract * [I] 2-7,9-12,14,15 | International search | [A]WO0120539 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US], et al); | [A]CN1480000 (REVEO INC [US]); | [A]CN101466998 (GEOMETRIC INFORMATICS INC [US]) |