EP2649449 - BIOMARKERS FOR TUBERCULOSIS AND HIV/AIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steyn, Andries J.C. 1420 Tree Crossings Parkway Hoover, AL 35244 / US | For all designated states Crossman, David K. 3461 Lynngate Circle Hoover, AL 35216 / US | For all designated states Henostroza, German 1530 3rd Avenue South, THT 229 Birmingham, AL 35294 / US | For all designated states Kimerling, Michael 4423 Phinney Avenue N No. B Seattle, WA 98103 / US | [2013/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11877185.6 | 09.12.2011 | WO2011US64194 | Priority number, date | US20100421482P | 09.12.2010 Original published format: US 421482 P | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012079003 | Date: | 14.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2649449 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569, G01N33/68, C12Q1/04, G06F17/00, G06F19/18 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
G01N33/5695 (EP,US);
G01N33/56988 (EP,US);
G01N33/6863 (US);
G01N33/6869 (US);
G16B20/00 (EP,US);
G16B25/10 (EP,US);
G01N2333/35 (EP,US);
G01N2333/49 (EP,US);
G01N2333/523 (US);
G01N2333/525 (US);
G01N2333/535 (US);
G01N2333/5412 (US);
G01N2333/5415 (US);
G01N2333/5418 (US);
G01N2333/5434 (US);
G01N2333/55 (US);
G01N2333/70503 (US);
G01N2333/70546 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/42] | G01N33/569, G01N33/68, C12Q1/04, G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Title | German: | BIOMARKER FÜR TUBERKULOSE UND HIV/AIDS | [2013/42] | English: | BIOMARKERS FOR TUBERCULOSIS AND HIV/AIDS | [2013/42] | French: | BIOMARQUEURS POUR LA TUBERCULOSE ET LE VIH/SIDA | [2013/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - Hong Van Tieu ET AL, "CLINICAL TRIALS/CLINICAL STUDIES Immunologic Markers as Predictors of Tuberculosis-Associated Immune Reconstitution Inflammatory Syndrome in HIV and Tuberculosis Coinfected Persons in Thailand", doi:10.1089/aid.2009.0055, (20091101), pages 1083 - 1089, URL: http://online.liebertpub.com/doi/pdf/10.1089/aid.2009.0055, (20140407), XP055112586 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * in particular: * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/aid.2009.0055 | [A] - QIU B ET AL, "Chemokine expression dynamics in mycobacterial (type-1) and schistosomal (type-2) antigen-elicited pulmonary granuloma formation", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY; [10640], ELSEVIER INC, US, (20010401), vol. 158, no. 4, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 1503 - 1515, XP002451321 [A] 1-10 * abstract * |