EP2792778 - AIRFLOW DYEING MACHINE CAPABLE OF INDEPENDENTLY SUPPLYING AIR BY MULTIPLE PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Falmer Investments Limited 3rd floor, Omar Hodge Building, Wickhams Cay I, P.O. Box 362 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUI, Tak Ming William Flat F , 6th Floor Hyde Park Mansion 53 Paterson Street Causeway Bay Hong Kong / CN | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Hryszkiewicz, Danuta, et al Matthias Scholl, Inc. Friedrichstrasse 123 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Hryszkiewicz, Danuta Kancelaria Patentowa Matthias Scholl, Inc. Skrytka Pocztowa 13 75-454 Koszalin / PL | Application number, filing date | 11877221.9 | 14.12.2011 | WO2011CN83995 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013086709 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2792778 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D06B23/00, D06B1/02, D06B3/28, D06B23/14 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
D06B3/28 (EP,KR);
D06B23/00 (KR);
D06B1/02 (KR);
D06B23/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/43] | D06B23/00, D06B1/02, D06B3/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | LUFTSTROMFÄRBEMASCHINE FÜR UNABHÄNGIGE ZUFUHR VON LUFT DURCH MEHRERE LEITUNGEN | [2014/43] | English: | AIRFLOW DYEING MACHINE CAPABLE OF INDEPENDENTLY SUPPLYING AIR BY MULTIPLE PIPES | [2014/43] | French: | MACHINE DE TEINTURE À FLUX D'AIR CAPABLE D'AMENER DE L'AIR DE MANIÈRE INDÉPENDANTE AU MOYEN DE MULTIPLES TUYAUX | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2013 | Translation filed | 18.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 28.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/25] | 13.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0512189 (FLAINOX SRL [IT]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, lines 25-52 *; | [X]US2006253999 (CHRIST WILHELM [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0026] - [0030] - [0041]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2007283725 (CORDES CARL [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1908872 (FALMER INVESTMENT LTD [VG]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0032]; figure 5 *; | [A]CN201209205Y (TANG JIAWEI [CN]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101591845 (ZHEJIANG JUNCTION TECHNOLOGIES [CN]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101613919 (WUXI DONGBAO MACHINE MANUFACTU) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102080318 (GUANGZHOU PANYU GOFRONT FINISHING EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURE CO LTD) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | International search | [A]DE19548862 (THEN MASCH & APP [DE]); | [A]CN2359312Y (YANG YONGSHUO [CN]); | [A]JP2002069832 (INOUE KINZOKU KOGYO CO LTD); | [A]CN101591845 (ZHEJIANG JUNCTION TECHNOLOGIES [CN]); | [A]CN101613919 (WUXI DONGBAO MACHINE MANUFACTU); | [A]CN102080318 (GUANGZHOU PANYU GOFRONT FINISHING EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURE CO LTD) |