EP2497714 - Recovery and braking device for objects flying freely in space [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrium GmbH Robert-Koch-Str. 1 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | [2012/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brüge, Uwe Sagterländer Strasse 2a 28259 Bremen / DE | 02 /
Starke, Jürgen Rockwinkler Landstrasse 45 D-28355 Bremen / DE | 03 /
Bischof, Bernhard Husumer Strasse 19 27777 Ganderkesee / DE | 04 /
Sommer, Josef Husumer Strasse 6 28844 Weyhe / DE | 05 /
Dumke, Michael Masurenweg 24 23844 Bad Oldesloe / DE | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12000561.6 | 28.01.2012 | [2012/37] | Priority number, date | DE20111013875 | 08.03.2011 Original published format: DE102011013875 | [2012/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2497714 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2497714 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/62, B64G1/10, B64G1/64 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
B64G1/62 (EP,US);
B64G1/1078 (US);
B64G1/1081 (EP);
B64G1/2427 (EP,US);
B64G1/40 (EP,US);
B64G1/646 (US);
B64G1/6462 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Title | German: | Bergungs- und Abbremsvorrichtung für frei im All fliegende Objekte | [2012/37] | English: | Recovery and braking device for objects flying freely in space | [2012/37] | French: | Dispositif de dégagement et de freinage pour des objets volant librement dans l'espace | [2012/37] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 11.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2012 | AL | 18.09.2013 | BG | 18.09.2013 | CY | 18.09.2013 | CZ | 18.09.2013 | DK | 18.09.2013 | EE | 18.09.2013 | FI | 18.09.2013 | HR | 18.09.2013 | LT | 18.09.2013 | LV | 18.09.2013 | MC | 18.09.2013 | MK | 18.09.2013 | MT | 18.09.2013 | NL | 18.09.2013 | PL | 18.09.2013 | RO | 18.09.2013 | RS | 18.09.2013 | SE | 18.09.2013 | SI | 18.09.2013 | SK | 18.09.2013 | SM | 18.09.2013 | TR | 18.09.2013 | NO | 18.12.2013 | GR | 19.12.2013 | IS | 18.01.2014 | PT | 20.01.2014 | IE | 28.01.2014 | LU | 28.01.2014 | BE | 31.01.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.01.2012 | |
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MK | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
TR | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 28.01.2012 | |
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
TR | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.01.2012 | |
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 18.09.2013 | |
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 18.09.2013 | |
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 18.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH07251799 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [AD]DE10342954 (EADS SPACE TRANSP GMBH [DE]); | [AD]DE10342953 (ASTRIUM GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE102004004543 (ELLINGHAUS FRANK [DE]) | by applicant | JPH07251799 | DE10342954 | DE10342953 |