EP2492806 - Unified interface for meta model checking, modifying, and reporting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandt, Carsten c/o SAP AG Global IP Group Dietmar-Hoppe-Allee 16 69190 Waldorf / DE | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12000578.0 | 30.01.2012 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | US201113017748 | 31.01.2011 Original published format: US201113017748 | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2492806 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
G06F8/10 (EP,US);
G06F8/43 (EP,US);
G06F8/73 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vereinheitlichte Schnittstelle zur Metamodellüberprüfung, Modifizierung und Berichterstattung | [2012/35] | English: | Unified interface for meta model checking, modifying, and reporting | [2012/35] | French: | Interface unifiée pour la vérification, la modification et le rapport de méta modèles | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.05.2014 | 24.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/37] | 04.05.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 08.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2065799 (SAP AG [DE]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I] - FRÉDÉRIC JOUAULT ET AL, Transforming Models with ATL, SATELLITE EVENTS AT THE MODELS 2005 CONFERENCE LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 128 - 138, (20060101), ISBN 978-3-540-31780-7, XP019027766 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * |