EP2484208 - Feeding installation for livestock and method for its operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keller, Erwin Ostpreussenstrasse 10 97215 Uffenheim / DE | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Abel, Martin Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Abel, Martin Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12000616.8 | 31.01.2012 | [2012/32] | Priority number, date | DE20111010219 | 03.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011010219 | [2012/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2484208 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01K5/02, A01K39/01 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
A01K5/02 (EP);
A01K5/0283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fütterungsanlage für die Tierhaltung und Verfahren zu ihrem Betreiben | [2012/32] | English: | Feeding installation for livestock and method for its operation | [2012/32] | French: | Installation et procédé d'alimentation pour animaux | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 20.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE19756367 (KELLER ERWIN [DE]) [AD] 1,10-12 * column 3, line 2 - column 5, line 42; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9000384 (ALFA LAVAL AGRI INT [SE]) [A] 1,12 * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9310659 (STEINER JOHANN [AT]) [A] 1,12 * pages 17,18; figure 14 * | by applicant | DE19756367 |