EP2455361 - Triethyleneglycol ester based plasticizer composition for polyvinyl chloride resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyunkyu 101-508 Sejong Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-city 305-728 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Kyeseok 8-46 Lg Company Housing Apt. 381-42 Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | 03 /
Lee, Kyu-Il 101-604 Songgang Cheonsol Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-city 305-752 / KR | 04 /
Chun, Byoungkue 9-502 Lg Company Housing Apt. 639 Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12000656.4 | 12.04.2006 | [2012/21] | Priority number, date | KR20050030376 | 12.04.2005 Original published format: KR 20050030376 | KR20060022714 | 10.03.2006 Original published format: KR 20060022714 | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2455361 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2455361 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/708, C07C69/734, C08K5/05 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
C07C67/08 (EP,US);
H04M1/7243 (KR);
C07C69/78 (EP,US);
C08K5/101 (US);
C08K5/103 (EP);
H04W4/12 (KR);
C08K2201/014 (EP);
H04M2201/34 (KR);
H04M2201/36 (KR);
H04M2250/06 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/08, C07C69/78 (EP,US);
C08K5/101, C08L27/06 (US);
C08K5/103, C08L27/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/21] | Title | German: | Auf Triethylenglycolester basierende Weichmacherzusammensetzung für Polyvinylchloridharz | [2012/21] | English: | Triethyleneglycol ester based plasticizer composition for polyvinyl chloride resin | [2012/21] | French: | Composition de base plastifiant à base d'ester de triéthylèneglycol pour résine de chlorure de polyvinyle | [2012/21] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 30.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 29.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 14.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06757430.1 / EP1868981 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB642039 (NOPCO CHEM CO) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2537595 (JACOB LEVY, et al) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [I]US2585448 (EMERSON WILLIAM S, et al) [I] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB715995 (MONSANTO CHEMICALS) [Y] 1-4* the whole document *; | [I]JPS5537428 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [I] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [I]JPH06127982 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [I] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6184278 (ARENDT WILLIAM DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO02083621 (VELSICOL CHEMICAL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005023926 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document; in particular: paragraphs 1-10 in the description and claims 1-10 * |