EP2623653 - Position bar assembly for a knitwear machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Mayer Textilmaschinenfabrik GmbH Brühlstrasse 25 63179 Obertshausen / DE | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saal, Torsten Buckelgarten 20 64823 Gross-Umstadt / DE | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 12000750.5 | 04.02.2012 | [2013/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2623653 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D04B27/24, D04B27/32, D04B27/30 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
D04B27/24 (EP);
D04B27/30 (EP);
D04B27/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Legebarrenanordnung einer Kettenwirkmaschine | [2013/32] | English: | Position bar assembly for a knitwear machine | [2013/32] | French: | Agencement de barres de stockage d'un métier à tricoter à chaîne | [2013/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/33] | 19.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE10137601 (MAYER TEXTILMASCHF [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0036] , [ 0037]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4303967 (LIBA MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 29 - line 37; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3634021 (LIBA MASCHF) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 10; figures 1, 3 * | by applicant | DE10137601 |