EP2487398 - Tube or hose connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2016/24] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ziegler, Ralf Beethovenstrasse 38 71726 Benningen / DE | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Lehle, Josef AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2012/33] | Application number, filing date | 12000820.6 | 08.02.2012 | [2012/33] | Priority number, date | DE20111011168 | 14.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011011168 | [2012/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487398 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2487398 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/08, F16L33/28, F01P11/04, F02M35/10 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
F16L33/08 (EP,US);
F02M35/10 (EP,US);
F16L33/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] |
Former [2012/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Rohr- oder Schlauchanschluss | [2012/33] | English: | Tube or hose connection | [2012/33] | French: | Raccordement de tuyau ou de flexible | [2012/33] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 08.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2012 | AL | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | CZ | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | ES | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | IT | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | MK | 15.06.2016 | MT | 15.06.2016 | NL | 15.06.2016 | PL | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | RS | 15.06.2016 | SE | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | SM | 15.06.2016 | TR | 15.06.2016 | NO | 15.09.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | AT | 08.02.2017 | IE | 08.02.2017 | LU | 08.02.2017 | BE | 28.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 08.02.2012 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
TR | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 08.02.2012 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 08.02.2012 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 08.02.2012 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.02.2012 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | |
NO | 15.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102005034567 (RAYMOND A & CIE [FR]) [X] 7,8 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015] * * figure - * [I] 1-6,9-14; | [XI]US3831954 (LONGFELLOW R) [X] 7,8,14 * page 3, line 36 - line 65 * * figures 3, 5 * [I] 1-6,9-13; | [A]DE102007057838 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US4440424 (MODE PAUL [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 7, line 8 - column 8, line 28 * * figure 2 *; | [A]FR2630808 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9600646 |