EP2511982 - Freight container with antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrium GmbH 81663 München / DE | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hornbostel, Klaus Karlshafener Strasse 57 28215 Bremen / DE | 02 /
Winkelmann, Andreas Bürgermeister-Schmelzing-Strasse 92b 47475 Kamp-Lintfort / DE | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Aulich, Martin, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Aulich, Martin, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12001045.9 | 17.02.2012 | [2012/42] | Priority number, date | DE20111016873 | 13.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011016873 | [2012/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2511982 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2511982 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/30, H01Q19/10, G08B13/24, G06Q10/08 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
H01Q9/30 (EP);
G08B13/24 (EP);
H01Q19/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Frachtbehälter mit Antenne | [2012/42] | English: | Freight container with antenna | [2012/42] | French: | Récipient de fret doté d'une antenne | [2012/42] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 03.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO03104114 (NAVITAG TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,15,16 * page 9, line 25 - page 17, line 31 * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 6,7 [I] 8; | [X]US7484391 (MOORE GREGORY B [US]) [X] 1,2,9,15,16 * column 4, line 57 - column 10, line 67 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO2006053566 (AP MOELLER MAERSK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,15,16 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 17 * * page 7, line 5 - page 11, line 11 * * figures 1,2A,2B,3A,3B,4 *; | [X]WO2006135124 (GALAXYGATE CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,9,15,16 * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 13 * * page 6, line 18 - page 12, line 15 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE1948104 (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 6,7 * page 1, line 9 - page 3, line 13 * * page 3, line 26 - page 9, line 16 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE1791197 (EHRENSPECK HERMANN W DR ING) [Y] 6,7 * pages 1-6 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE202004000680U (EVERFOCUS ELECTRONICS CORP [TW]) [Y] 6,7 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0021] - [0028] * * figures 1,3 * | by applicant | DE102009013104 |