EP2527303 - Reverse osmosis assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Völker, Manfred Meisenweg 1 63825 Blankenbach / DE | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Flosdorff, Jürgen Huss, Flosdorff & Partner GbR Klarweinstraße 39 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | [2015/19] |
Former [2012/48] | Flosdorff, Jürgen Alleestrasse 33 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12001827.0 | 17.03.2012 | [2012/48] | Priority number, date | DE201110102662 | 27.05.2011 Original published format: DE102011102662 | [2012/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2527303 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2527303 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/44, A61M1/16, B01D61/02, B01D61/12, B01D63/10, A61L2/04, B01D65/02, B01D61/58, B01D61/24, // C02F1/02, C02F1/38, C02F1/467, C02F1/48, C02F1/78, C02F103/02 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
B01D61/025 (EP,US);
A61M1/1656 (EP,US);
A61M1/1672 (EP,US);
B01D61/12 (EP,US);
B01D61/243 (EP,US);
B01D61/58 (EP,US);
B01D65/02 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
B01D2311/04 (EP,US);
B01D2311/08 (EP,US);
B01D2311/103 (EP,US);
B01D2311/2531 (EP,US);
B01D2311/2607 (EP,US);
B01D2311/2615 (EP,US);
B01D2311/2676 (EP,US);
B01D2311/2684 (EP,US);
B01D2311/2692 (EP,US);
B01D2321/08 (EP,US);
C02F1/02 (EP,US);
C02F1/385 (EP,US);
C02F1/4672 (EP,US);
C02F1/48 (EP,US);
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
C02F2103/026 (EP,US);
C02F2201/004 (EP,US);
C02F2201/005 (EP,US);
C02F2209/003 (EP,US);
C02F2209/008 (EP,US);
C02F2209/02 (EP,US);
C02F2209/055 (EP,US);
C02F2209/40 (EP,US);
C02F2301/043 (EP,US);
C02F2301/046 (EP,US);
C02F2303/04 (EP,US);
C02F2303/16 (EP,US);
C02F2303/22 (EP,US);
C02F2305/023 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/48] | C02F1/44, C02F9/00, A61L2/04, A61M1/16, B01D63/10, B01D61/02, B01D61/12, B01D61/58, B01D65/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] |
Former [2012/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RO-(Umkehrosmose) Anlage | [2012/48] | English: | Reverse osmosis assembly | [2012/48] | French: | Installation RO (osmose inverse) | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 04.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP15000211.1 / EP2865651 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2012 | AL | 06.05.2015 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | DK | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | FI | 06.05.2015 | HR | 06.05.2015 | IT | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | MK | 06.05.2015 | MT | 06.05.2015 | NL | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | RS | 06.05.2015 | SE | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | SM | 06.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | NO | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 17.03.2012 | |
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 06.05.2015 | |
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 06.05.2015 | |
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 06.05.2015 | |
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH0235916 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [XI]JPH02227128 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [XI]DE3941131 ; | [XI]DE19530190 (CWD REINSTWASSERSYSTEME CHRIST [DE]); | [XI]DE10262036 (VOELKER MANFRED [DE]); | [XPI]EP2423169 (VOELKER MANFRED [DE]) |