EP2487541 - Device for reading exposed image recording plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thoms, Michael Eichenweg 19 91054 Erlangen / DE | [2019/31] |
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states Thoms, Michael Eichenweg 19 91054 Erlangen / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Dürr Dental AG Höpfigheimer Strasse 17 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thoms, Michael Eichenweg 19 91054 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Nowacek, Wilhelm Keltergasse 17 74389 Cleebronn / DE | 03 /
Alzner, Edgar 164 Whitehall Boulevard Garden City, NY 11530 / US | 04 /
Gross, Walter 238 Hamilton Avenue Masspequa, NY 11758 / US | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/31] |
Former [2013/33] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Büro Nürnberg II Äußere Sulzbacher Straße 159/161 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | Ostertag, Reinhard, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte Epplestraße 14 D-70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12002548.1 | 23.08.2006 | [2012/33] | Priority number, date | DE20051046249 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005046249 | [2012/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2487541 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2487541 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2487541 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03B42/08, G01T1/29, G02B26/10 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
G03B42/08 (EP,KR,US);
G01T1/2016 (US);
G01T1/2014 (US);
G02B26/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/31] |
Former [2012/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gerät zum Auslesen belichteter Bildaufzeichnungsfolien | [2012/33] | English: | Device for reading exposed image recording plates | [2012/33] | French: | Appareil de lecture de feuilles d'enregistrement des images | [2012/33] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 20.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06777022.2 / EP1929371 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2006 | CY | 31.07.2019 | CZ | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | ES | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | NL | 31.07.2019 | PL | 31.07.2019 | RO | 31.07.2019 | SE | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | TR | 31.07.2019 | AT | 23.08.2019 | IE | 23.08.2019 | LU | 23.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | FR | 30.09.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BG | 31.10.2019 | GB | 31.10.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 23.08.2019 | ||
LU | 23.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GB | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 23.08.2019 | ||
LU | 23.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GB | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 23.08.2019 | ||
LU | 23.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GB | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 23.08.2019 | ||
LU | 23.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 23.08.2019 | ||
LU | 23.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 23.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | DK | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | DK | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | DK | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | ES | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4400619 (KOTERA NOBORU [JP], et al) [I] 17,23-26* column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [I]US4727252 (YOSHIMURA RYOICHI [JP], et al) [I] 1 * column 5, line 46 - column 7, line 38; figures 1-3 * * column 11, line 41 - column 14, line 51; figures 10,11 *; | [I]US4754145 (KOBAYASHI MASAAKI [JP]) [I] 17,21-23,25,26 * column 3, line 31 - column 9, line 8; figures 1-6 *; | [IA]US4816678 (TAKASAKI YOSHIMI [JP]) [I] 17,23 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 58; figure 1 * [A] 21,22; | [X]US5095209 (TAMURA KAORU [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 20 - column 6, line 65; figures 1,2 *; | [I]US5237177 (KIMURA TSUTOMU [JP]) [I] 1,12,14-16 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 10; figure 1 *; | [IA]JPH0862746 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [I] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-16; | [IA]US2004169152 (TSUTOH SATORU [JP], et al) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0059] - [0063] - [0092] - [0097]; figures 2,12 * [A] 2-16; | [I]US2005156126 (NAKAJO MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [I] 17,23-26 * paragraphs [0036] - [0041] - [0052] - [0060]; figures 2,5-8 *; | [A]US2005205813 (ISHIKAWA YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0041] - [0046] - [0067] - [0075]; figure 4 * |