EP2484272 - Body-insertable device system and in-vivo observation method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawano, Hironao OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
Takizawa, Hironobu OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 03 /
Segawa, Hidetake OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 04 /
Aoki, Isao OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 05 /
Hirakawa, Katsumi OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 06 /
Kobayashi, Satomi OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 07 /
Ito, Hideo OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/43] |
Former [2012/32] | 01 /
Kawano, Hironao c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
Takizawa, Hironobu c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
Segawa, Hidetake c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
Aoki, Isao c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
05 /
Hirakawa, Katsumi c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
06 /
Kobayashi, Satomi c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
07 /
Ito, Hideo c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12002780.0 | 28.12.2006 | [2012/32] | Priority number, date | JP20050380454 | 28.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005380454 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2484272 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2484272 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B5/07 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
A61B1/00016 (EP,US);
A61B1/00 (KR);
A61B1/00147 (EP,US);
A61B1/00156 (EP,US);
A61B1/00158 (EP,US);
A61B1/041 (EP,US);
A61B1/045 (US);
A61B1/273 (EP,US);
A61B34/73 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/32] | Title | German: | In den Körper einsetzbares Vorrichtungssystem und In-vivo-Beobachtungsverfahren | [2012/32] | English: | Body-insertable device system and in-vivo observation method | [2012/32] | French: | Système de dispositif insérable dans le corps et procédé d'observation in vivo | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 01.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06843617.9 / EP1969989 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060843617) is 28.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003060702 (KUTH RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0010] *; | [A]US2005093544 (RIES GUNTER [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph 52 "during free floating" *; | [A]US2005124875 (KAWANO HIRONAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * fig. 14; paragraphs 244 & 245 *; | [A]US2005192478 (WILLIAMS JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0032] *; | [IP]WO2006070369 (GIVEN IMAGING LTD [IL], et al) [IP] 1 * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 5 *; | [E]EP1967125 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [E] 1 * figure 48 *; | [E]EP1972253 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1 * paragraphs [0077] , [0078] * | by applicant | JP2004529718 |