EP2667485 - Electric motor and storage assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEANTEC Motor GmbH & Co. KG Hüttenstrasse 21 07318 Saalfeld / DE | [2015/11] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states Compound Disk Drives GmbH Gautinger Strasse 6 82319 Starnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hein, Sören Widenmayerstrasse 1 80538 München / DE | 02 /
Böbel, Friedrich Gartenstrasse 31 B 82547 Eurasburg / DE | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Steiniger, Carmen, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Steiniger Reichsstraße 37 09112 Chemnitz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Gellner, Bernd Gartenstrasse 32b 82547 Eurasburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/48] | Gellner, Bernd PATENTANWALT Gartenstrasse 32b 82547 Eurasburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12004079.5 | 25.05.2012 | [2013/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2667485 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2667485 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/30, H02K7/08 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
H02K1/30 (EP,US);
H02K1/2796 (US);
F16C19/06 (US);
H02K1/04 (US);
H02K7/08 (EP,US);
H02K7/088 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Title | German: | Elektromotor und Lagerungsanordnung | [2013/48] | English: | Electric motor and storage assembly | [2013/48] | French: | Moteur électrique et agencement de stockage | [2013/48] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 30.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2012 | AL | 19.11.2014 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | ES | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | HR | 19.11.2014 | IT | 19.11.2014 | LT | 19.11.2014 | LV | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | MK | 19.11.2014 | MT | 19.11.2014 | NL | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | RS | 19.11.2014 | SE | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | SM | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | NO | 19.02.2015 | GR | 20.02.2015 | IS | 19.03.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | IE | 25.05.2015 | LU | 25.05.2015 | BE | 31.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.05.2012 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MK | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 25.05.2015 | ||
LU | 25.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.05.2012 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 25.05.2015 | ||
LU | 25.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 25.05.2015 | ||
LU | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 25.05.2015 | ||
LU | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
LU | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
LU | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 19.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008014253 (TIMKEN CO [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * abstract * * page 1, line 7 - line 11 * * page 4, line 28 - page 53 * * page 7, line 4 - line 16 ** figures 1, 5 *; | [A]WO2010040535 (PRO DISKUS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,5,7-11 * page 4, lines 2-12 * * page 30, line 33 - page 33, line 27 * * figures 9 a-d, 10 a, b * | by applicant | DE102006036707 | DE102008050832 |