EP2546139 - Diving equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventics GmbH Ulmerstrasse 4 30880 Laatzen / DE | [2015/46] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Heinz-Hermann Bornstrasse 50 30926 Seelze / DE | 02 /
Hubein, Isabel Landwehrstrasse 56 30519 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Luessenhop, Riccardo Querfeldstrasse 2 31535 Neustadt A. Rbge. / DE | 04 /
Schulz, Janett Fiedelerplatz 6 30519 Hannover / DE | 05 /
Forsslund, Johan Essingetorget 40 112666 Stockholm / SE | 06 /
Moeller, Rudolf Brauereiweg 30 30989 Gehrden / DE | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Spahn, Tobias BBS Bier Brehm Spahn Partnerschaft Rechtsanwälte Brandstwiete 46 20457 Hamburg / DE | [2015/47] |
Former [2013/03] | Thürer, Andreas c/o Bosch Rexroth AG Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 12004608.1 | 20.06.2012 | [2013/03] | Priority number, date | DE201110107027 | 09.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011107027 | [2013/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2546139 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2546139 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B63C11/08, B63C11/22 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
B63C11/08 (EP);
B63C11/2245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2013/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Tauchausrüstung | [2013/03] | English: | Diving equipment | [2013/03] | French: | Equipement de plongée | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 20.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2012 | AL | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | DK | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | ES | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | HR | 18.11.2015 | IT | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | MK | 18.11.2015 | MT | 18.11.2015 | NL | 18.11.2015 | PL | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | RS | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | SM | 18.11.2015 | TR | 18.11.2015 | NO | 18.02.2016 | GR | 19.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | PT | 18.03.2016 | GB | 20.06.2016 | IE | 20.06.2016 | LU | 20.06.2016 | BE | 30.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 20.06.2012 | |
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 20.06.2016 | ||
IE | 20.06.2016 | ||
LU | 20.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 20.06.2016 | ||
IE | 20.06.2016 | ||
LU | 20.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 20.06.2016 | ||
IE | 20.06.2016 | ||
LU | 20.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 20.06.2016 | ||
IE | 20.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 20.06.2016 | ||
IE | 20.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008143581 (CONSENSUM AS [NO], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 7, lines 3-14 * * page 10, lines 6-14 * * page 33, lines 10-12 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [AD]WO2007058615 (CONSENSUM AS [NO], et al) [AD] 1 * page 5, lines 22-31 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0034569 (GROSS PAVEL [CH], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2007058615 |