EP2508204 - Remedies for diseases caused by vascular contraction or dilation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakade, Shinji c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 17-2, Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Hidehiro c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 17-2, Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | 03 /
Habashita, Hiromu c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/41] | 01 /
Nakade, Shinji c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 17-2, Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | ||
02 /
Suzuki, Hidehiro c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 17-2, Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | |||
03 /
Habashita, Hiromu c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 17-2, Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005031.5 | 25.06.2003 | [2012/41] | Priority number, date | JP20020185546 | 26.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002185546 | [2012/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2508204 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2508204 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2508204 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K31/437, A61K31/445, A61P9/00, A61P9/06, A61P9/10, A61P9/12, A61P9/14, A61P13/12, A61P25/06, A61P43/00, C07D211/48, C07D471/04 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/41] | Title | German: | Mittel für Krankheiten, die durch vaskuläre Kontraktion oder Dilatation verursacht sind | [2014/15] | English: | Remedies for diseases caused by vascular contraction or dilation | [2012/41] | French: | REMEDES POUR LES MALADIES PROVOQUEES PAR LA CONTRACTION OU LA & xA;DILATATION VASCULAIRE | [2014/15] |
Former [2012/41] | Abhilfen für Krankheiten, die durch vaskuläre Kontraktion oder Dilatation verursacht sind | ||
Former [2012/41] | Remèdes pour les maladies provoquées par la contraction ou la dilatation vasculaire | Examination procedure | 06.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 12.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03761797.4 / EP1522314 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030761797) is 14.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2003 | AT | 24.09.2014 | BE | 24.09.2014 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | DK | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | ES | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | IT | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | NL | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | SE | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | PT | 26.01.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.06.2003 | |
AT | 24.09.2014 | ||
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
SE | 24.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9931267 (SEPRACOR INC [US]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO0197786 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * page 109; example 343 * * page 111; example 354 * * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 3 * [I] 5,9; | [X]WO0205819 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,6-10 * page 27, lines 33-36; claims 2,3 * * page 32, lines 22-31 * * claim 5 *; | [XP]WO03045313 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,6-8,10* page 153; claim 6; compounds 242, 243 *; | [E]WO03051274 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [E] 1,6-10 * page 14; compound 23 * * page 1, line 7 *; | [X] - PANDEY B R ET AL, "Central nervous system depressant, analgesic and monoamine oxidase inhibitory properties of substituted piperidines", RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS IN CHEMICAL PATHOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY, PJD PUBLICATIONS LTD., WESTBURY, NY, US, (19840101), vol. 43, no. 1, ISSN 0034-5164, pages 173 - 176, XP008145805 [X] 1,6-8 * page 175; table I * | by applicant | US2868691 | US3095355 | WO0103739 | JP2001261575 | WO0198301 | - SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 248, page 1653 | - STROKE, (2001), vol. 32, page 2913 | - BRITISH J. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 130, page 1871 | - EUR. J. NEUROSCI., (2001), vol. 14, page 203 |