EP2562745 - Method and apparatus for impulse response measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/09] | Method and apparatus for impulse response measurement and simulation | ||
[2018/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vainiala, Mikko Pekka Merimiehenkatu 2 B 4 28900 Pori / FI | [2019/07] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Vainiala, Mikko Pekka Uusitalontie 28800 Pori / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Norris, Timothy Sweyn Basck 50 - 60 Station Road Cambridge CB1 2JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/07] | Norris, Timothy Sweyn Basck 16 Saxon Road Cambridge CB5 8HS / GB | ||
Former [2013/09] | Norris, Timothy Sweyn BasckIPR Ltd. 9 Meadowford Newport Saffron Walden Essex CB11 3QL / GB | Application number, filing date | 12005289.9 | 19.07.2012 | [2013/09] | Priority number, date | GB20110012675 | 22.07.2011 Original published format: GB 201112675 | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2562745 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2562745 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2562745 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/16, G10H3/18, H04R29/00 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
G10H1/16 (EP,GB,US);
G10H3/187 (EP,US);
H03F1/327 (GB);
H04R29/001 (EP,GB,US);
H04S7/00 (GB);
G10H2210/311 (EP,US);
G10H2250/111 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Impulsantwortmessung | [2018/35] | English: | Method and apparatus for impulse response measurement | [2018/35] | French: | Procédé et appareil de mesure de réponse impulsionnelle | [2018/35] |
Former [2013/09] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Impulsantwortmessung und -simulation | ||
Former [2013/09] | Method and apparatus for impulse response measurement and simulation | ||
Former [2013/09] | Procédé et appareil de simulation et de mesure de réponse impulsionnelle | Examination procedure | 09.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 19.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2012 | AL | 13.02.2019 | AT | 13.02.2019 | CY | 13.02.2019 | CZ | 13.02.2019 | EE | 13.02.2019 | ES | 13.02.2019 | HR | 13.02.2019 | LT | 13.02.2019 | LV | 13.02.2019 | MC | 13.02.2019 | MK | 13.02.2019 | MT | 13.02.2019 | NL | 13.02.2019 | PL | 13.02.2019 | RO | 13.02.2019 | RS | 13.02.2019 | SI | 13.02.2019 | SK | 13.02.2019 | SM | 13.02.2019 | TR | 13.02.2019 | BG | 13.05.2019 | NO | 13.05.2019 | GR | 14.05.2019 | IS | 13.06.2019 | PT | 13.06.2019 | FI | 19.07.2019 | GB | 19.07.2019 | IE | 19.07.2019 | IT | 19.07.2019 | LU | 19.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.07.2019 | ||
GB | 19.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
IT | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.07.2019 | ||
GB | 19.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
IT | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.07.2019 | ||
GB | 19.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
IT | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.07.2019 | ||
GB | 19.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
IT | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.07.2019 | ||
GB | 19.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.07.2019 | ||
GB | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.07.2019 | ||
GB | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.07.2019 | ||
GB | 19.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HR | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 13.02.2019 | |
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | LT | 13.02.2019 | |
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | LT | 13.02.2019 | |
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 13.02.2019 | |
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]WO0028521 (SINTEFEX AUDIO LDA [PT], et al); | [XY]CN101426169 (JIAXING ZHONGKE ACOUSTIC TECHN [CN]); | by applicant | WO0028521 |