EP2550913 - A microscope for ophthalmologic surgery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Topcon 75-1 Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nomura, Kazuhisa c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Topcon 75-1 Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 02 /
Kitajima, Nobuaki 3-41-616, Shinshiraoka Shiraoka-machi Minamisaitama-gun Saitama, 349-0212 / JP | 03 /
Sato, Toshiaki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Topcon 75-1 Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Gagel, Roland, et al Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | Gagel, Roland, et al Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005340.0 | 20.07.2012 | [2013/05] | Priority number, date | JP20110166906 | 29.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011166906 | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2550913 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2550913 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/103, // A61B3/13, G02B21/00, A61F2/16, A61B5/11 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
A61B3/1035 (EP,US);
A61B5/1103 (EP,US);
G02B21/0012 (EP,US);
G02B21/22 (EP,US);
A61B2505/05 (EP,US);
A61B3/132 (EP,US);
A61B5/6821 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/05] | A61B3/103, // A61B3/13, G02B21/00, A61F2/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mikroskop für ophthalmologische Chirurgie | [2013/05] | English: | A microscope for ophthalmologic surgery | [2013/05] | French: | Microscope pour chirurgie ophtalmologique | [2013/05] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 03.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP2011110172 (TOPCON CORP) [YD] 1,3-8,12 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0021] , [0024] , [0045] - [0049] - [0074] *; | [Y]EP2138093 (NIDEK KK [JP]) [Y] 1,3-8,12 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0020] , [0035] , [0037] , [0038] , [0050] *; | [A]JP2000157493 (NIDEK KK) [A] 3,4,6 * figures 2,4,5 *; | [A]US5585872 (KOHAYAKAWA YOSHIMI [JP]) [A] 3,4,6 * figures 2,3 * * column 3, lines 17-21 *; | [A]US5807273 (SUZUKI NOBUO [JP]) [A] 3,4,6 * column 7, lines 34-36 * | by applicant | JP2011110172 |