EP2551653 - Long-period vibration sensor and method for correcting output value of the long-period vibration sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP | [2018/45] |
Former [2013/05] | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Senkoji, Daigo c/o Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP | 02 /
Matsushiro, Ken c/o Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP | 03 /
Yamakawa, Hiroshi c/o Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP | 04 /
Yamada, Tomoharu c/o Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/45] |
Former [2013/05] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005470.5 | 26.07.2012 | [2013/05] | Priority number, date | JP20110166549 | 29.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011166549 | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2551653 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2551653 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2551653 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01H11/02, G01V1/18, G01V13/00 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
G01V13/00 (EP,US);
G01H11/02 (EP,US);
G01V1/182 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/05] | G01H11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2013/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Langzeitvibrationssensor und Verfahren zur Korrektur des Ausgabewertes des Langzeitvibrationssensors | [2013/05] | English: | Long-period vibration sensor and method for correcting output value of the long-period vibration sensor | [2013/05] | French: | Capteur de vibrations à longue période et procédé de correction de valeur de sortie du capteur de vibrations à longue période | [2013/05] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 13.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2012 | AL | 07.11.2018 | AT | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | HR | 07.11.2018 | IT | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | MT | 07.11.2018 | NL | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | RS | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | SM | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | NO | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | GB | 26.07.2019 | IE | 26.07.2019 | LU | 26.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | FR | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 26.07.2012 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 26.07.2019 | ||
IE | 26.07.2019 | ||
LU | 26.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.07.2012 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 26.07.2019 | ||
IE | 26.07.2019 | ||
LU | 26.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 26.07.2019 | ||
IE | 26.07.2019 | ||
LU | 26.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 26.07.2019 | ||
IE | 26.07.2019 | ||
LU | 26.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 26.07.2019 | ||
LU | 26.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 26.07.2019 | ||
LU | 26.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 26.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
NO | 07.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3412374 (MITCHELL WALTER R) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 15 *; | [A]US3509636 (HANSEN SIEGFRIED) [A] 1-4 * figures 1,5 * * column 6, lines 30-61 *; | [Y]WO2006076925 (PINOCCHIO DATA SYSTEMS APS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, line 15 - page 3, line 29 * * page 8, lines 7-20 * * page 17, line 5 - page 24, line 26 *; | [A]US2007179713 (SCOTT GARY L [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract ** paragraphs [0008] , [0010] - [0013] - [0026] , [0030] *; | [Y]WO2009055117 (WESTERNGECO LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0031] , [0042] , [0068] , [0072] - [0079] *; | [IY]US2010296366 (KAMATA MASAHIRO [JP]) [I] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0024] - [0035] - [0098] , [0131] , [0137] * [Y] 3 | by applicant | JP2006201096 |