EP2692731 - Recombinant Adeno-Associated virus (AAV) vector particles displaying high-affinity ligands for cell-type specific gene delivery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul-Ehrlich-Institut Bundesamt für Sera und Impfstoffe Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 51-59 63225 Langen / DE | For all designated states Universität zu Köln Albertus-Magnus-Platz 50923 Köln / DE | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bucholz, Christian Schulstrasse 10 60594 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Münch, Robert Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 28 60596 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
Büning, Hildegard Aachenerstrasse 590 50933 Köln / DE | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005565.2 | 31.07.2012 | [2014/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2692731 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/005, A61K48/00, C12N15/86 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
A61K48/005 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP);
C07K2319/74 (EP);
C12N2750/14122 (EP);
C12N2750/14143 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rekombinante AAV-Vektorparitikel mit Liganden hoher Affinität für Zelltyp-spezifischen Gentransfer | [2014/06] | English: | Recombinant Adeno-Associated virus (AAV) vector particles displaying high-affinity ligands for cell-type specific gene delivery | [2014/06] | French: | Particules de vecteur AAV présentant des ligands à affinité élevée pour l'administration de gènes spécifique du type cellulaire | [2014/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 12.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03054197 (MEDIGENE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0220565 (UNIV ZUERICH [CH], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y] - MÜLLER O J ET AL, "Random peptide libraries displayed on adeno-associated virus to select for targeted gene therapy vectors", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 21, no. 9, doi:10.1038/NBT856, ISSN 1087-0156, (20030901), pages 1040 - 1046, (20030803), XP002596751 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT856 | [Y] - NICKLIN S A ET AL, "Efficient and selective AAV2-mediated gene transfer directed to human vascular endothelial cells", MOLECULAR THERAPY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20010901), vol. 4, no. 3, doi:10.1006/MTHE.2001.0424, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 174 - 181, XP002297272 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mthe.2001.0424 | [Y] - NI-CHUNG LEE ET AL, "An acidic oligopeptide displayed on AAV2 improves axial muscle tropism after systemic delivery", GENETIC VACCINES AND THERAPY, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20120618), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1479-0556-10-3, ISSN 1479-0556, page 3, XP021133105 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1479-0556-10-3 | [Y] - ROBERT C MÜNCH ET AL, "DARPins: An Efficient Targeting Domain for Lentiviral Vectors", MOLECULAR THERAPY, (20110401), vol. 19, no. 4, doi:10.1038/mt.2010.298, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 686 - 693, XP055092878 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2010.298 | [Y] - K FRIEDRICH ET AL., "Effective DARPin-targeted oncolytic measles viruses directed against HER2/neu, EGFR, or EpCAM expressing tumor cells", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (20111001), vol. 22, no. 10, doi:10.1089/hum.2011.2525, ISSN 1043-0342, page A97, XP055036692 [Y] 1-12 * Poster 261 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2011.2525 | [Y] - Mikheeva G et al., "Design of Bi-Specific DARPin-Derived Adapters for Targeting of Adenovirus Vectors", (20090530), 12th Annual Meeting of the American Society of Gene Therapy, URL: http://www.asgct.org/am09/final_program.pdf, (20120717), XP055032939 [Y] 1-7,10-12 * Poster 850 * | [A] - ZAHND ET AL, "A Designed Ankyrin Repeat Protein Evolved to Picomolar Affinity to Her2", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, (20070517), vol. 369, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JMB.2007.03.028, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 1015 - 1028, XP022083577 [A] 8,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2007.03.028 | [A] - ANDREAS SCHWEIZER ET AL, "CD4-Specific Designed Ankyrin Repeat Proteins Are Novel Potent HIV Entry Inhibitors with Unique Characteristics", PLOS PATHOGENS, (20080725), vol. 4, no. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.ppat.1000109, page e1000109, XP055092927 [A] 8,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.ppat.1000109 | by applicant | US2006286545 | US2009202490 | EP1975239 | - GAO, G. ET AL., J. VIROL., (2004), pages 6381 - 6388 | - KOTIN, R. M., HUM. GENE THER., (1994), pages 793 - 801 | - MINGOZZI, F.; K. A. HIGH, NAT. REV. GENET., vol. 12, pages 341 - 355 | - WAEHLER, R. ET AL., NAT. REV. GENET., (2007), pages 573 - 587 | - BUNING, H. ET AL., J. GENE MED., (2008), vol. 10, pages 717 - 733 | - DAVIDSON, B. L. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 3428 - 3432 | - RIED, M. U. ET AL., J. VIROL., (2002), vol. 76, pages 4559 - 4566 | - XIAO, X. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 2224 - 2232 | - XIE, Q. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 10405 - 10410 | - KRAMER, M. A. ET AL., J. MOL. BI- OL., (2010), vol. 404, pages 381 - 391 | - KERN, A. ET AL., J. VIROL., (2003), vol. 77, pages 11072 - 11081 | - WOBUS, C. E. ET AL., J. VIROL., (2000), vol. 74, pages 9281 - 9293 | - BOUCAS, J. ET AL., J. GENE MED., (2009), vol. 11, pages 1103 - 1113 | - MUNCH, R. C. ET AL., MOL. THER., (2011), vol. 19, pages 686 - 693 | - ZAHND, C. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2007), vol. 369, pages 1015 - 1028 | - MUNCH, R. C., MOL. THER., (2011), vol. 19, pages 686 - 693 | - Virus Construction Kit - The Manual, (2010), pages 1 - 218 | - STEINER, D. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2008), vol. 382, pages 1211 - 1227 | - MUNCH, R.C. ET AL., MOL. THER., (2011), vol. 19, pages 686 - 693 | - KWONG, P. D. ET AL., NATURE, vol. 393, pages 648 - 659 | - SCHWEIZER, A. ET AL., PLOS PATHOG., (2008), vol. 4, page E1000109 | - ANLIKER, B. ET AL., NAT. METH., (2010), vol. 7, pages 929 - 935 | - GIROD, A. ET AL., NAT. METH., (1999), pages 1052 - 1056 | - LUX, K. ET AL., J. VIROL., (2005), vol. 79, pages 11776 - 11787 | - MÜNCH, R. C. ET AL., MOL. THER., (2011), vol. 19, pages 686 - 693 | - HACKER, U. T. ET AL., J. GENE MED., (2005), vol. 7, pages 1429 - 1438 | - FUNKE, S. ET AL., MOL. THER., (2008), vol. 16, pages 1427 - 1436 | - BAUM, C. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1995), vol. 69, pages 7541 - 7547 | - RATY, J. K. ET AL., CURR. MOL. PHARMACOL., (2008), vol. 1, pages 13 - 23 |