EP2562459 - Pipe holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sikla Holding GmbH Kornstrasse 4 4614 Marchtrenk / AT | [2013/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Warkus, Clemens Eisenbahnstrasse 16 78628 Rottweil / DE | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät W. Maucher und H. Börjes-Pestalozza Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät W. Maucher und H. Börjes-Pestalozza Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005612.2 | 02.08.2012 | [2013/09] | Priority number, date | DE201110111717 | 26.08.2011 Original published format: DE102011111717 | [2013/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2562459 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/035 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
F16L3/1207 (EP);
F16L55/035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rohrhalterung | [2013/09] | English: | Pipe holder | [2013/09] | French: | Crochet de tuyau | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010243855 (SAMPSON JAMES M [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [Y] 2-4 [I] 6-9; | [X]US6530609 (CHATTERTON ANDREW MYLES [CA]) [X] 1,5 * abstract *; | [Y]US3564676 (OESER KONRAD) [Y] 2-4 * abstract *; | [A]DE29505312U (HESTERBERG EBERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure - *; | [A]DE1848044U (FERCH & NABBEN [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figure - *; | [A]GB572691 (ADEL PREC PRODUCTS CORP) [A] 1-9 * figure - * | by applicant | DE102009000865 |