EP2560218 - Illumination device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/47] |
Former [2015/11] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeidoi, Naoko Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Nishioka, Kouji Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Yamaguchi, Sayaka Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Saito, Takashi Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/48] |
Former [2013/08] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005705.4 | 06.08.2012 | [2013/08] | Priority number, date | JP20110179077 | 18.08.2011 Original published format: JP 2011179077 | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2560218 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2560218 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/50, F21K99/00, // F21Y101/02 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
H01L33/504 (EP,US);
H05B33/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] |
Former [2013/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsgerät | [2013/08] | English: | Illumination device | [2013/08] | French: | dispositif d'éclairage | [2015/19] |
Former [2013/08] | Dispositif d'éclairage | Examination procedure | 14.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2012 | AL | 25.11.2015 | AT | 25.11.2015 | BE | 25.11.2015 | BG | 25.11.2015 | CY | 25.11.2015 | CZ | 25.11.2015 | DK | 25.11.2015 | EE | 25.11.2015 | ES | 25.11.2015 | FI | 25.11.2015 | HR | 25.11.2015 | IT | 25.11.2015 | LT | 25.11.2015 | LV | 25.11.2015 | MC | 25.11.2015 | MK | 25.11.2015 | NL | 25.11.2015 | PL | 25.11.2015 | RO | 25.11.2015 | RS | 25.11.2015 | SE | 25.11.2015 | SI | 25.11.2015 | SK | 25.11.2015 | SM | 25.11.2015 | TR | 25.11.2015 | NO | 25.02.2016 | GR | 26.02.2016 | IS | 25.03.2016 | PT | 25.03.2016 | GB | 06.08.2016 | IE | 06.08.2016 | LU | 06.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 06.08.2012 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
GB | 06.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.08.2012 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
GB | 06.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 06.08.2012 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
GB | 06.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.08.2012 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
GB | 06.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
GB | 06.08.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP2010176992 (SHARP KK) [YD] 1-4 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2006310817 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0 11] * * paragraphs [0014] , [0 61]; figures 1-3, 6 *; | [A]WO2011002087 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0003] *; | [A]US2010127282 (HARBERS GERARD [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 22] - [0025] * | by applicant | JP2010176992 | JPH11258047 | - YANO TADASHI, VIEW OF THE PREFERENCE INDEX PS OF SKIN COLOR OF JAPANESE WOMEN |