EP2700557 - Device and method for measuring the pressing power of the brake linings on brake discs of rail vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2019 | Opposition rejected | published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RöschConsult International Ltd. Darmstädter Strasse 62 64354 Reinheim / DE | [2014/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rösch, Wolfgang Neuberg 5 64823 Gross-Umstadt / DE | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Jany, Peter, et al c/o LICHTI Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bergwaldstraße 1 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Jany, Peter, et al Patentanwalt Karlstraße 87 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2014/09] | Jany und Petersen Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Karlstraße 87 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 12005981.1 | 21.08.2012 | [2014/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2700557 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2700557 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B61H5/00, B60T17/22, F16D65/092 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
B60T17/228 (EP,CN);
B61H5/00 (EP,CN);
F16D65/092 (CN);
F16D66/00 (EP);
F16D2066/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] |
Former [2014/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Messen der Anpresskraft der Bremsbeläge an Bremsscheiben von Schienenfahrzeugen | [2014/09] | English: | Device and method for measuring the pressing power of the brake linings on brake discs of rail vehicles | [2014/09] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de mesure de la force de pression des garnitures de frein sur les disques de frein de véhicules sur rails | [2014/09] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 26.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.09.2016
12.10.2016
ADMISSIBLE Prodat Informatik GmbH Johannisthaler Str. 7 01996 Hosena / DE Opponent's representative Sauer, Stephan Loschwitzer Straße 42 01309 Dresden / DE | [2017/32] |
Former [2016/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.09.2016
Prodat Informatik GmbH Johannisthaler Str. 7 01996 Hosena / DE | 14.11.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.03.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.01.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.02.2018 | 06.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.2019 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/39] | 16.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.05.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.05.2019 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.08.2012 | AL | 16.12.2015 | BG | 16.12.2015 | CY | 16.12.2015 | CZ | 16.12.2015 | DK | 16.12.2015 | EE | 16.12.2015 | ES | 16.12.2015 | FI | 16.12.2015 | HR | 16.12.2015 | IT | 16.12.2015 | LT | 16.12.2015 | LV | 16.12.2015 | MC | 16.12.2015 | MK | 16.12.2015 | MT | 16.12.2015 | NL | 16.12.2015 | PL | 16.12.2015 | RO | 16.12.2015 | RS | 16.12.2015 | SE | 16.12.2015 | SI | 16.12.2015 | SK | 16.12.2015 | SM | 16.12.2015 | TR | 16.12.2015 | NO | 16.03.2016 | GR | 17.03.2016 | IS | 16.04.2016 | PT | 18.04.2016 | GB | 21.08.2016 | IE | 21.08.2016 | LU | 21.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 21.08.2012 | |
BG | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
MT | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
GB | 21.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.08.2012 | |
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
MT | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
GB | 21.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.08.2012 | |
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
GB | 21.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.08.2012 | |
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
GB | 21.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
GB | 21.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 16.12.2015 | |
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 16.12.2015 | |
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 16.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10022759 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0032]; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2009077331 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 13, line 4 - page 14, line 2; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2008071578 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 12; figures 4,5 * | Opposition | DE202010012124U | - DEGENSTEIN, THOMAS; et al., "Messung der Kräfte in der Reibfläche einer Scheibenbremse während des Bremsvorgangs", Technische Universität Darmstadt Fachgebiet Fahrzeugtechnik Zusammenfassung, XP055314523 | - DEGENSTEIN, T., "Kraftmessung in Scheibenbremsen.", Fortschritt- Berichte VDI Reihe 12 Nr. 655, Düsseldorf |