EP2705902 - Method for hydrating nitro-aromatics with selected platinum catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AllessaChemie GmbH Alt Fechenheim 34 60386 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2015/19] |
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states AllessaChemie GmbH Alt Fechenheim 34 60386 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neumann, Doris Auf der Rosenhöhe 30 63069 Offenbach / DE | 02 /
Ritzer, Joachim Südring 50 63817 Rodenbach / DE | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Ackermann, Joachim, et al Mannheimer Straße 97 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/45] |
Former [2014/11] | Ackermann, Joachim Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Ackermann Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 12006277.3 | 06.09.2012 | [2014/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2705902 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2705902 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J27/188, C07C209/36, C07C211/52 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
C07C209/365 (EP,US);
B01J27/188 (EP,US);
B01J21/18 (EP,US);
B01J23/42 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (US)
| C-Set: |
C07C209/365, C07C211/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] |
Former [2014/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Hydrierung von Nitroaromaten mit ausgewählten Platinkatalysatoren | [2014/11] | English: | Method for hydrating nitro-aromatics with selected platinum catalysts | [2014/11] | French: | Procédé destiné à l'hydrogénisation de nitro-aromates avec des catalyseurs platines sélectionnés | [2014/11] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 15.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2012 | AL | 06.05.2015 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | DK | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | ES | 06.05.2015 | FI | 06.05.2015 | HR | 06.05.2015 | IT | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | MK | 06.05.2015 | MT | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | RS | 06.05.2015 | SE | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | SM | 06.05.2015 | TR | 06.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | NO | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | IE | 06.09.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | LU | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.09.2012 | |
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IE | 06.09.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
LU | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 06.09.2012 | |
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IE | 06.09.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
LU | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IE | 06.09.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
LU | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IE | 06.09.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
LU | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
LU | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
LU | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
LU | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 06.05.2015 | |
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 06.05.2015 | |
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2011036479 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [ID] 1-17 * claims 1-14 *; | [A]EP0842920 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [A] - CHEN, ZHAOYANG ET AL, "Preparation and nitrobenzene electro- reduction performance of tungsten carbide supported platinum catalysts", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2009:328967, URL: STN, XP002694921 [A] 1-17 * abstract * | [A] - A. MALTHA ET AL, "Transition metal oxides as catalysts for the selective reduction of nitrobenzene", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS, Elsevier, (1994), vol. 93, ISSN 0304-5102, pages 305 - 316, XP002694922 [A] 1-17 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-5102(94)00121-9 | by applicant | WO9636597 | EP0842920 | WO2011036479 | DE3537247 | - P. BAUMEISTER; H.-U. BLASER; M. STUDER, CATALYSIS LETTERS, (1997), vol. 49, pages 219 - 222 | - U. SIEGRIST; P. BAUMEISTER; H.-U. BLASER; M. STUDER, Catalysis of Organic Reactions, DEKKER, (1998), vol. 75, pages 207 - 219 | - ZHAO; CHOU; CHEN, INDUSTRIAL & ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, (2010), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 1669 - 1676 |