EP2581132 - Tube bundle reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Energy Solutions SE Stadtbachstrasse 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [2018/52] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states MAN Diesel & Turbo SE Stadtbachstrasse 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehr, Manfred Leebstr. 11 94469 Deggendorf / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2013/16] | 01 /
Lehr, Herrn Manfred Leebstr. 11 94469 Deggendorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12007102.2 | 12.10.2012 | [2013/16] | Priority number, date | DE20111084476 | 13.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011084476 | [2013/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2581132 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2581132 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/06 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
B01J8/067 (EP);
B01J2208/00212 (EP);
B01J2208/00221 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2013/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rohrbündelreaktor | [2013/16] | English: | Tube bundle reactor | [2013/16] | French: | Réacteur à faisceau tubulaire | [2013/16] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 07.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/19] | Divisional application(s) | EP18186804.3 / EP3417933 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 07.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004052525 (MAN DWE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 6 - page 7, paragraph 2; figures 1, 2, 11 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2004052524 (GUETLHUBER FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2201528 (DEGGENDORFER WERFT EISENBAU) [A] 11,12 * abstract * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 60; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1080781 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 11,12 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 24 - paragraph 27; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XY]DE10127374 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 13,15 * abstract * * column 5, paragraph 34 - column 6, paragraph 39; figures 3, 5; claim 1 * [Y] 14; | [XY]DE10137768 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 13 * abstract * * column 9, paragraph 65 - paragraph 67; figure 4; claim 1 * [Y] 14; | [XY]WO0009253 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 13,15 * abstract * [Y] 14 | by applicant | DE1963394 | DE3409159 | WO2004105252 | DE10137768 | JPS59138794 | DE10127365 | WO2004052526 | DE2245442 |